EP2084747 - MONOLITHIC IC AND MEMS MICROFABRICATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alces Technology, Inc. 650 West Elk Avenue Jackson, Wyoming 83001 / US | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEH, Richard P.O. Box 12685 Jackson, Wyoming 83002 / US | 02 /
BLOOM, David M. 4750 Cortland Drive Jackson, Wyoming 83001 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07864561.1 | 16.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US85022 | Priority number, date | US20060602087 | 20.11.2006 Original published format: US 602087 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008064135 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084747 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B81C1/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H01L27/06 (EP,US);
B81C1/00246 (EP,US);
B81C2203/0742 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H01L29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | MIKROHERSTELLUNGSERFAHREN FÜR MONOLITHISCHE IC UND MEMS | [2009/32] | English: | MONOLITHIC IC AND MEMS MICROFABRICATION PROCESS | [2009/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE MICROFABRICATION DE CI ET DE MEMS MONOLITHIQUES | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 25.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6531331 (BENNETT REID [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0028] - [0041]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005177045 (DEGERTEKIN F L [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0051] - [0063]; figure 3 *; | [A] - BROSRIHAN T J ET AL, "Optical IMEMS- a fabrication process for mems optical switches with integrated on-chip electronics", TRANSDUCERS, SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, 12TH INN ATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030609), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7731-8, pages 1638 - 1642, XP010647532 [A] 13 * page 1641, column l, lines 11-13; figures 1,4 * | [A] - JIN X ET AL, "The microfabrication of capacitive ultrasonic transducers", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (19980903), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1109/84.709646, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 295 - 301, XP002976182 [A] 15,21 * Section "III. FABRICATION" starting on page 296, right-hand column,;; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/84.709646 | [A] - BLOOM ET AL, "The Grating light valve: revolutionizing display technology", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, (19970201), vol. 3013, doi:10.1117/12.273868, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 165 - 171, XP009018300 [A] 1-21 * Section "2. Building the GLV device" starting on page 166 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.273868 | International search | [A]US5573679 (MITCHELL ALAN W [US], et al); | [X]US6943037 (ANAGNOSTOPOULOS CONSTANTINE N [US], et al); | [A]US7078337 (CAMPBELL TIMOTHY S [US], et al) |