EP2099283 - BALER WITH MULTI-AUGER PICKUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGCO CORPORATION 4205 River Green Parkway Duluth GA 30096 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states AGCO CORPORATION 4205 River Green Parkway Duluth GA 30096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRAG, Thomas, G. 4428 Harvest Lane Hesston, KS 67062 / US | 02 /
ESAU, Edward, W. 76-29th Avenue Hesston, KS 67062 / US | 03 /
GRABER, Kurt 204 Elm Street Moundridge, KS 67107 / US | 04 /
ZECHA, Ryan, A. 408 Wheatridge Drive Newton, KS 67114 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/38] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07865129.6 | 03.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007US86299 | Priority number, date | US20070620458 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 620458 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008085619 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2099283 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2099283 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/00, A01F15/10, A01D89/00 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
A01D89/008 (EP,US);
A01D89/005 (EP,US);
A01F15/10 (EP,US);
A01F2015/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | A01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | BALLENPRESSER MIT MEHRSCHNECKENAUFNEHMER | [2009/38] | English: | BALER WITH MULTI-AUGER PICKUP | [2009/38] | French: | PRESSE AVEC MÉCANISME DE RAMASSAGE À PLUSIEURS VIS SANS FIN | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 16.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 19.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2007 | AT | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | IE | 03.12.2013 | LU | 03.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.12.2007 | |
AT | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6679042 (SCHRAG THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 3, line 6 - column 9, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2005210855 (BANDSTRA JERRY E [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,4 * | International search | [X]US6679042 (SCHRAG THOMAS G [US], et al); | [A]US6601375 (GRAHL SCOTT V [US], et al); | [A]US2002066264 (BERGKAMP ALAN R [US], et al) | by applicant | US4106268 | US6679042 |