EP2102750 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING COPIES OF DATA, SUCH AS ARCHIVE COPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/39] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CREATING COPIES OF DATA, SUCH AS ARCHIVE COPIES | ||
[2014/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commvault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport, NJ 07757-0090 / US | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNTE, Alan c/o Commvault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | 02 /
PRAHLAD, Anand c/o Commvault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | 03 /
BROCKWAY, Brian c/o Commvault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | 04 /
MULLER, Marcus S. c/o Commvault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
BUNTE, Alan c/o CommVault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | ||
02 /
PRAHLAD, Anand c/o CommVault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | |||
03 /
BROCKWAY, Brian c/o CommVault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | |||
04 /
MULLER, Marcus S. c/o CommVault Systems, Inc. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport New Jersey 07757-0090 / US | |||
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
BUNTE, Alan 2 Crescent Place Oceanport, NJ 07757-0090 / US | ||
02 /
PRAHLAD, Anand 2 Crescent Place Oceanport, NJ 07757-0090 / US | |||
03 /
BROCKWAY, Brian 2 Crescent Place Oceanport, NJ 07757-0090 / US | |||
04 /
MULLER, Marcus S. 2 Crescent Place Oceanport, NJ 07757-0090 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07865192.4 | 04.12.2007 | [2014/45] | WO2007US86421 | Priority number, date | US20060868518P | 04.12.2006 Original published format: US 868518 P | US20060871737P | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 871737 P | US20060882884P | 29.12.2006 Original published format: US 882884 P | US20060882883P | 29.12.2006 Original published format: US 882883 P | US20070001485 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 1485 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008070688 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102750 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102750 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F11/14, G06F21/62 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
G06F16/113 (EP,US);
G06F11/1451 (EP,US);
G06F16/325 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | G06F11/14 | ||
Former IPC [2009/39] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON DATENKOPIEN WIE ETWA ARCHIVKOPIEN | [2014/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING COPIES OF DATA, SUCH AS ARCHIVE COPIES | [2014/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE DE CRÉATION DE COPIES DE DONNÉES, TELLES DES COPIES D'ARCHIVES | [2014/45] |
Former [2009/39] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON DATENKOPIEN WIE ETWA ARCHIVKOPIEN | ||
Former [2009/39] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CREATING COPIES OF DATA, SUCH AS ARCHIVE COPIES | ||
Former [2009/39] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CRÉATION DE COPIES DE DONNÉES, TELLES DES COPIES D'ARCHIVES | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 22.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2007 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | LU | 04.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.12.2007 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006230244 (AMARENDRAN ARUN P [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0028] , [0045] , [0049] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] *; | [X]WO2006052872 (COMMVAULT SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0035] , [0036] , [0043] , [0045] , [0047] , [0 66] , [0068] * * pages 1-4 *; | [A]WO03027891 (COMMVAULT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 23 * * page 12, lines 15-23 * * page 14, lines 4-25 * * page 18, lines 10-15 * | International search | [A]US2005033756 (KOTTOMTHARAYIL RAJIV [US], et al); | [Y]US2006005048 (OSAKI NOBUYUKI [US], et al); | [Y]US2006010227 (ATLURI RAJEEV [US]); | [Y]US2006053305 (WAHLERT BRIAN M [US], et al); | [Y]US2006230244 (AMARENDRAN ARUN P [IN], et al); | [Y]US2006242489 (BROCKWAY BRIAN [US], et al) |