EP2089209 - INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Frank 1622 Diamond Brook Drive Houston, TX 77062 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2019/34] |
Former [2009/34] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 07865241.9 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007US86505 | Priority number, date | US20060633932 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 633932 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008070720 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2089209 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089209 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/72, B29C45/73, C08K5/00, C08K5/12, C08K5/521, C08L23/16, // B23K23/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B29C45/0001 (EP,US);
B29C45/72 (KR);
B29C45/00 (KR);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/527 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08K5/527, C08L23/142 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/34] | B29C45/72, B29C45/73 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZGIESSVERFAHREN | [2009/34] | English: | INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS | [2009/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 16.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2018 | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2007 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | LU | 05.12.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.12.2007 | |
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005161866 (BATLAW RAJNISH [US], et al) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0012] , [0015] , [0041] , [0045] , [0046] *; | [A]US2006079613 (HANSSEN ROB [BE]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0 27] - [0028] - [0 57] - [0063] * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO2006065799 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 54] - [0057] * * claims 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2006173132 (MEHTA ASPY K [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0057] , [0063] , [0066] , [0101] , [0120] *; | [XPL]US2006279026 (THIERRY-MIEG JEROME [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0015]; claims 1,5,6 * * sentence 9, paragraph 33 * * claims 1,3,4,7,8,12 * [L] 1-15; | [XPL]WO2007024721 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,6-9,12-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * [L] 1-4,6-9,12-15 | International search | [Y]US6759124 (ROYER JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [Y]US2006128842 (BURMASTER DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [X]US2006173132 (MEHTA ASPY K [US], et al) | by applicant | US6262199 | US6313242 | US6949208 | US7037103 | WO2006065799 |