EP2104518 - A BIODEGRADABLE OSTEOGENIC POROUS BIOMEDICAL IMPLANT WITH IMPERMEABLE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKAY, William F. 3870 McElrie Cove Memphis, TN 37133 / US | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07865372.2 | 07.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007US86771 | Priority number, date | US20060610957 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: US 610957 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008076671 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104518 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00, A61L27/44, A61L27/46 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
A61L24/0015 (EP,US);
A61F2/2846 (EP,US);
A61L24/0036 (EP,US);
A61L24/0042 (EP,US);
A61L24/02 (EP,US);
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61L24/102 (EP,US);
A61L27/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61C8/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61F2/2803 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2825 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2853 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00179 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00365 (EP,US);
A61L2300/252 (EP,US);
A61L2300/402 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/046, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARES OSTEOGENES PORÖSES BIOMEDIZINISCHES IMPLANTAT MIT UNDURCHLÄSSIGER MEMBRAN | [2009/40] | English: | A BIODEGRADABLE OSTEOGENIC POROUS BIOMEDICAL IMPLANT WITH IMPERMEABLE MEMBRANE | [2009/40] | French: | IMPLANT BIOMÉDICAL POREUX OSTÉOGÉNIQUE BIODÉGRADABLE À MEMBRANE IMPERMÉABLE | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4394370 (JEFFERIES STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-12 *; | [X]WO9919005 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,17 * claims 1-22 *; | [X]WO0045871 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * claims 1-36 *; | [A]EP1338291 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0022]; claims 1-10 *; | [A] - TAGUCHI Y ET AL, "A histological evaluation for guided bone regeneration induced by a collagenous membrane", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 26, no. 31, ISSN 0142-9612, (20051101), pages 6158 - 6166, (20051101), XP025280174 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.03.023 |