EP2097379 - CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS ION CHANNEL MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELLE, Robert 67 Boon Road Stow, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
MAZDIYASNI, Hormoz 27 Bouffard Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
GALULLO, Vincent 10 Blackstone Lane South Grafton, MA 01560 / US | 04 /
BAKER, Christopher Todd 33 Curve Street Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 05 /
WILL, Paul 35 Crystal Lake Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 06 /
GUO, Jinsong Room 101, Unit 2 Building 17, Hui-Hua-Yuan Hui-Long-Guan, Chang-Ping Beijing 102208 / CN | 07 /
SOENEN, Danielle 10 Twain Street Irvine, CA 92617 / US | 08 /
FENSOME, Andrew 779 Trephanny Lane Wayne, PA 10987 / US | 09 /
KERN, Jeffrey Curtis 1344 Second Avenue Gilbertsville, PA 19525 / US | 10 /
MOORE, William Jay 108 Fox Run Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 11 /
MELENSKI, Edward George 112 Hemlock Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 12 /
KAPLAN, Justin 24 South 43rd Street Philiadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Hodge, Emma Jane, et al Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Hodge, Emma Jane, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07865495.1 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007US87077 | Priority number, date | US20060874206P | 11.12.2006 Original published format: US 874206 P | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008073936 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097379 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/36, C07D213/74, C07D277/42, A61K31/435, A61K31/426, A61P9/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C07D213/36 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | CARBOXAMIDDERIVATE ALS IONENKANALMODULATOREN | [2009/37] | English: | CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS ION CHANNEL MODULATORS | [2009/37] | French: | DERIVES DE CARBOXAMIDE UTILISES EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DES CANAUX IONIQUES | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11139969 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO) [X] 1-61 * pages 27,31 *; | [A]WO2005000285 (DYNOGEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-61 * the whole document *; | [A] - GRIBKOFF, V.K. ET AL., "Voltage-gated cation channel modulators for the treatment of stroke", EXPERT OPINION INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2005), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 579 - 592, XP002474727 [A] 1-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.14.5.579 | [PA] - XU, T.L. ET AL., "Dynamic Regulation of Acid-Sensing Ion Channels by Extracellular and Intracellular Modulators", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 14, pages 1753 - 1763, XP002474728 [PA] 1-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/092986707780059580 |