EP2114569 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING A METAL AND SEPARATING ARSENIC FROM AN ARSENIC CONTAINING SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Molycorp Minerals, LLC HC1 Box 224 Mountain Pass, CA 92366 / US | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBA, John L., III 9359 Hidden Pines Ct. Parker, Colorado 80134 / US | 02 /
HASSLER, Carl R. 12408 Tanager Drive Northwest Gig Harbor, Washington 98332 / US | 03 /
O'KELLEY, C. Brock 3620 W. Pebble Rd. Las Vegas, Nevada 89139 / US | 04 /
WHITEHEAD, Charles F. 875 East Silverado Ranch Blvd., Apt 2063 Las Vegas, Nevada 89183 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Thompson, Trevor George Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Thompson, Trevor George Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07865811.9 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007US87952 | Priority number, date | US20060882376P | 28.12.2006 Original published format: US 882376 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008082959 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2114569 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/00, C02F1/42 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
B01D15/00 (EP,US);
B01J20/0207 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J39/10 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/4678 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,US);
C02F2101/103 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Extension states | AL | 27.07.2009 | BA | 27.07.2009 | HR | 27.07.2009 | MK | 27.07.2009 | RS | 27.07.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG EINES METALLS UND ABTRENNUNG VON ARSEN AUS EINER ARSENHALTIGEN LÖSUNG | [2009/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING A METAL AND SEPARATING ARSENIC FROM AN ARSENIC CONTAINING SOLUTION | [2009/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'UN MÉTAL, ET DE SÉPARATION D'ARSENIC À PARTIR D'UNE SOLUTION CONTENANT DE L'ARSENIC | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 28.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006207945 (WITHAM RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0012] , [0016] - [0017] - [0023] - [0026] * [I] 2,5,7,10,13,15; | [I]US6666903 (GREEN FREDERICK H [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 29 - line 44 * * column 9, line 38 - line 50 * * column 10, line 38 - line 47 * | International search | [X]US2004178149 (HERNANDEZ MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2006254930 (MARTINIE GARY D [SA], et al); | [Y]US2002132725 (LABARGE WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005133455 (WITHAM RICHARD D [US], et al); | [Y]US2006237369 (KIRTS RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]US2005061746 (SMITH PAUL K [US], et al) |