EP2076734 - OPTICAL IMAGING APPARATUS WITH SPECTRAL DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optos PLC Queensferry House Carnegie Business Campus Dunfermline Fife KY11 8GR / GB | [2014/02] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states OTI-Ophthalmic Technologies Inc. 37 Kodiak Crescent, Unit No. 16 Downsview Ontario M3J 3E5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODGERS, John 48 Sumner Close Canterbury Kent CT2 8LJ / GB | 02 /
HATHAWAY, Mark 13 New Town Street Chartham Hatch Canterbury Kent CT4 7LT / GB | [2013/29] |
Former [2009/28] | 01 /
ROGERS, John 48 Sumner Close Canterbury Kent CT2 8LJ / GB | ||
02 /
HATHAWAY, Mark 13 New Town Street Chartham Hatch Canterbury Kent CT4 7LT / GB | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2009/28] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07866187.3 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007CA01771 | Priority number, date | GB20060019616 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: GB 0619616 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052311 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2076734 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2076734 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, G01B9/02, A61B3/10, G01N21/64 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G01B9/02044 (EP,US);
A61B3/102 (EP,US);
G01B9/0203 (EP,US);
G01B9/02089 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | G01B11/24, A61B3/10, G01B11/22, G01B9/023 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES BILDGEBUNGSGERÄT MIT SPEKTRALDETEKTOR | [2009/28] | English: | OPTICAL IMAGING APPARATUS WITH SPECTRAL DETECTOR | [2009/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE OPTIQUE AVEC DÉTECTEUR SPECTRAL | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2007 | AT | 29.01.2014 | BE | 29.01.2014 | BG | 29.01.2014 | CY | 29.01.2014 | CZ | 29.01.2014 | DK | 29.01.2014 | EE | 29.01.2014 | FI | 29.01.2014 | IT | 29.01.2014 | LT | 29.01.2014 | LV | 29.01.2014 | MC | 29.01.2014 | MT | 29.01.2014 | NL | 29.01.2014 | PL | 29.01.2014 | RO | 29.01.2014 | SI | 29.01.2014 | SK | 29.01.2014 | TR | 29.01.2014 | GR | 30.04.2014 | IS | 29.05.2014 | PT | 29.05.2014 | IE | 05.10.2014 | LU | 05.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 29.01.2014 | |
IS | 29.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006176448 (VAN DE VELDE FRANS J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]JP2006212153 (NIDEK KK) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [E]WO2007130411 (PHYSICAL SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5 * page 8, line 6 - page 11, line 26; figure 1 * * page 13, line 3 - line 5 * * page 16, line 8 - line 27; figure 6 *; | [E]EP1908397 (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [E] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0128]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0237] - paragraph [0270]; figures 10-12 *; | [E]EP2012653 (PHYSICAL SCIENCES INC [US]) [E] 1-3,5 * see WO-publication *; | [A] - ROSEN RICHARD B ET AL, "Simultaneous OCT/SLO/ICG system", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20060220), vol. 6079, ISSN 1605-7422, pages 60790A - 1, XP002480537 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PODOLEANU A G ET AL, "Combined multiplanar optical coherence tomography and confocal scanning ophthalmoscopy", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US LNKD- DOI:10.1117/1.1627778, (20040101), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1083-3668, pages 86 - 93, XP002375532 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1627778 | International search | [Y]US5192980 (DIXON ARTHUR E [CA], et al); | [A]US6927860 (PODOLEANU ADRIAN GH [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2006039091 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) |