EP2225371 - I-MSOI HOMING ENDONUCLEASE VARIANTS HAVING NOVEL SUBSTRATE SPECIFICITY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellectis 102 avenue Gaston Roussel 93235 Romainville Cedex / FR | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIZOT, Sylvestre 35 rue de l'Aigle F-92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Leblois-Préhaud, Hélène Marthe Georgette, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Leblois-Préhaud, Hélène Marthe Georgette, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Petersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07866638.5 | 28.11.2007 | [2010/36] | WO2007IB04376 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068937 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225371 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | I-MSOI-HOMING-ENDONUKLEASEVARIANTEN MIT NEUER SUBSTRATSPEZIFITÄT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2010/36] | English: | I-MSOI HOMING ENDONUCLEASE VARIANTS HAVING NOVEL SUBSTRATE SPECIFICITY AND USE THEREOF | [2010/36] | French: | VARIANTS D'ENDONUCLÉASE HOMING I<I>-MSOI</I>AYANT UNE NOUVELLE SPÉCIFICITÉ DE SUBSTRAT ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 03.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007047859 (PREC BIOSCIENCES [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 41; table 2 *; | [Y] - SELIGMAN L M ET AL, "Mutations altering the cleavage specificity of a homing endonuclease", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20020901), vol. 30, no. 17, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3870 - 3879, XP002282592 [Y] 1-24 * page 3875, paragraph L - page 3878 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkf495 | [Y] - ASHWORTH JUSTIN ET AL, "Computational redesign of endonuclease DNA binding and cleavage specificity", NATURE (LONDON), (200606), vol. 441, no. 7093, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 656 - 659, XP002486330 [Y] 1-24 * page 656, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature04818 | [A] - CHEVALIER B ET AL, "Flexible DNA Target Site Recognition by Divergent Homing Endonuclease Isoschizomers I-CreI and I-MsoI", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20030530), vol. 329, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 253 - 269, XP004454255 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(03)00447-9 |