EP2153676 - A METHOD FOR THE FORWARDING OF SMS IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Vikas 856, Sector-13, Urban Estate Karnal-132001, Haryana / IN | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07866644.3 | 25.05.2007 | [2010/07] | WO2007IB52719 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008146097 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153676 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP);
H04W4/16 (EP);
H04W88/184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WEITERLEITEN VON SMS IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2010/07] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE FORWARDING OF SMS IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2010/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRANSFERT DE SMS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1613102 (BMD WIRELESS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] *; | [A]WO2006056791 (INTELLPROP LTD; WILSON JEFFREY [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 24 * * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 13 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 27 *; | [A]EP1626590 (TELSIS HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0019] - [0024] , [0025] * |