EP2086315 - COLOR CHANGE SURGICAL PREP SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CareFusion 2200, Inc. 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2010/04] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Allegiance Corporation 1430 Waukegan Road McGaw Park, IL 60085-6787 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yeong H. 18537 Aspen Ct. Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 02 /
BAROT, Nancy 20 South Parliament Way Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/33] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07867163.3 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US20925 | Priority number, date | US20060542791 | 03.10.2006 Original published format: US 542791 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060355 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086315 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086315 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A01N31/02, A01N31/08, A01N31/12, A01N31/16, A01N47/44, A01N59/12, A01P1/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
A01N37/36 (EP,US);
A01N25/00 (KR);
A01N31/02 (EP,KR,US);
A01N31/08 (EP,KR,US);
A01N31/12 (EP,KR,US);
A01N31/16 (EP,US);
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01N59/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/08, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/16, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N47/44, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORBEREITUNGSLÖSUNG MIT FARBWECHSEL | [2009/33] | English: | COLOR CHANGE SURGICAL PREP SOLUTION | [2009/33] | French: | SOLUTION DE PRÉPARATION CHIRURGICALE À CHANGEMENT DE COULEUR | [2018/34] |
Former [2009/33] | SOLUTION DE PREPARATION CHIRURGICALE A CHANGEMENT DE COULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2007 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | IE | 27.09.2019 | LU | 27.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.09.2007 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2050829 (BABOR GMBH & CO DR) [X] 1-35 * examples 1-7; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US4678658 (CASEY IRENE [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * examples I-IV; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US5064635 (CASEY IRENE [US]) [X] 1-35 * examples 1-6; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US3355392 (ABRAHAM CANTOR, et al) [X] 1-35 * examples I-II; claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP1044686 (GILBERT SA LAB [FR]) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US4568534 (STIER ROGER E [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * column 2, paragraph 3; examples 1-3; claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0420713 (SHAGBARK RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-3; tables II-IV *; | [X]WO02102150 (FLIT S A [CH], et al) [X] 1-35 * example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [X]JP2002256291 ; | [X]WO9614826 (SEEUV [US]) [X] 1-35 * page 14, line 18 - page 18, line L; claims 1,15,25 *; | [X]WO0076558 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 2; claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO9823255 (SCHERING PLOUGH HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-35 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 7; examples 1-3; claim 17 *; | [X]US6146618 (BELL ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * examples 1-3; claim 19 *; | [X]US6007797 (BELL ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * examples 1-3 *; | [X]GB2326340 (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-35 * page 1, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 2 * * example 1 *; | [X]US5997891 (FUERST RONNIE S [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * examples 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9960089 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * examples I,II; claims 1-26 *; | [X]WO9426233 (FUERST RONNIE S [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 4, paragraphs 2,3; claims 1-24 *; | [X]WO2004031334 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 12, line 1 - page 14, line L *; | [X]FR2594000 (GOUWS & SCHEEPERS PTY LTD [ZA]) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-15 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]US5278132 (FISHER JONAH [ZA], et al) [X] 1-35 * column 3, line 10; examples 1,2; claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0549145 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-35 * examples 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP1457529 (BRILLUX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0023]; examples 1-5; claims 1-21 *; | [E]WO2007130982 (ENTURIA INC [US]) [E] 1-35 * examples 1-10; claims 1-29 *; | [PX]WO2007008389 (C2C TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-35 * paragraph [0021]; claim 6 *; | [PX]WO2006105191 (C2C TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-35 * pages 132-193; claims 1-38 *; | [PX]WO2006105260 (C2C TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-35 * examples 1-17 *; | [PX]WO2006105261 (C2C TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-35 * examples 1-17 *; | [PX]WO2006105193 (C2C TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-35 * paragraphs [0283] - [0340]; claims 1-26 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 72, Database accession no. 2002-671628, XP002528724 & JP2002256291 A 20020911 (ALTAN KK) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | Examination | US5547662 |