EP2125008 - METHOD FOR TREATING PAIN OR OPIOID DEPENDENCE USING A SPECIFIC TYPE OF NON-OPIOID AGENT IN COMBINATION WITH A SELECTIVE EXCITATORY-OPIOID-RECEPTOR INACTIVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albert Einstein College of Medicine of Yeshiva University 1300 Morris Park Avenue Bronx, NY 10467 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Albert Einstein College Of Medecine Of Yeshiva University 1300 Morris Park Avenue Bronx, NY 10467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAIN, Stanley M. 2472 Pine Hurst Ct. State College, PA 16803 / US | 02 /
SHEN, Ke-Fei 144-30 Sanford Avenue Apt. 6J Flushing, NY 11355 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Paemen, Liesbet R.J., et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Paemen, Liesbet R.J., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners E. Gevaertdreef 10 A 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07867224.3 | 12.10.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007US21836 | Priority number, date | US20060855775P | 01.11.2006 Original published format: US 855775 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060381 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2125008 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/106, A61K31/44, A61K31/19, A61K31/557, A01N43/42, A01N37/08, A01N53/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN ODER OPIOID-ABHÄNGIGKEIT MIT EINER BESTIMMTEN ART VON NICHT-OPIOID-MITTEL IN KOMBINATION MIT EINEM SELEKTIVEN EXZITATORISCHEN OPIOID-REZEPTOR-INAKTIVATOR | [2009/49] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING PAIN OR OPIOID DEPENDENCE USING A SPECIFIC TYPE OF NON-OPIOID AGENT IN COMBINATION WITH A SELECTIVE EXCITATORY-OPIOID-RECEPTOR INACTIVATOR | [2009/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR TRAITER UNE DOULEUR OU UNE DEPENDANCE AUX OPIOIDES EN UTILISANT UN TYPE SELECTIF D'AGENT NON OPIOIDE EN COMBINAISON UN INACTIVATEUR DE RECEPTEUR OPIOEIDE A EXCITATION SELECTIVE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2011 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2011 | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5585348 (CRAIN STANLEY M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,13-15 * claims 1,2,7,8 *; | [I]WO02076388 (EINSTEIN COLL MED [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0095] , [0096] , [0099] , [0101] *; | [XI] - MAMIYA T ET AL, "Involvement of cyclic AMP systems in morphine physical dependence in mice: prevention of development of morphine dependence by rolipram, a phosphodiesterase 4 inhibitor", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, (20010301), vol. 132, no. 5, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1111 - 1117, XP002426073 [X] 1-5,12-13 * page 1111, column r, paragraph l * * page 1113, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 1114, column r * [I] 11,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0703912 | [XI] - AINHOA BILBAO ET AL, "Absence of quasi-morphine withdrawal syndrome in adenosine A2A receptor knockout mice", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060401), vol. 185, no. 2, ISSN 1432-2072, pages 160 - 168, XP019326835 [X] 2,4,6-7,9-10,12-13 * page 163, paragraph l * * abstract * [I] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00213-005-0284-0 | [I] - TOKUYAMA SHOGO ET AL, Direct evidence for a role of glutamate in the expression of the opioid withdrawal syndrome, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, VOL. 295, NR. 2-3, PAGE(S) 123-129, (1996), ISSN 0014-2999, XP009129788 [I] 1-15 * page 125, column r - page 127, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 128, column l, paragraph 3 * | International search | [Y]US6270979 (SADEE WOLFGANG [US]); | [Y]US6331543 (GARVEY DAVID S [US], et al); | [X]WO2008008380 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al); | [Y]US7405207 (LEONARD SHERRY A [US], et al); | [Y] - CHEN ET AL., "Cholera toxin-B subunit blocks excitatory opioid receptor-mediated hyperalgesic effects in mice, thereby unmasking potent opioid analgesia and attenuating opioid tolerance/dependence", BRAIN RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 919, pages 20 - 30, XP008113907 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(01)02990-0 |