EP2089051 - ENHANCED IMMUNOGENICITY OF TUMOR ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS BY ADDITION OF ALPHAGAL EPITOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2503 South Loop Drive Building 5, Suite 5100 Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive, Suite 3550 Ames, IA 50010 / US | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive, Suite 3550 Ames, IA 50010 / US | ||
For all designated states JAIPURI, Firoz Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3 Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIPURI, Firoz Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | 02 /
MAUTINO, Mario R. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | 03 /
VAHANIAN, Nicholas N. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Won-Bin Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | 05 /
ROSSI, Gabriela Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | 06 /
LINK, Charles, J., Jr. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
JAIPURI, Firoz Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | ||
02 /
MAUTINO, Mario R. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | |||
03 /
VAHANIAN, Nicholas N. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | |||
04 /
YOUNG, Won-Bin Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | |||
05 /
ROSSI, Gabriela Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | |||
06 /
LINK, Charles, J., Jr. Newlink Genetics Iowa State University Research Park 2901 South Loop Drive Building 3, Suite 3900 Ames, IA 50010 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07867281.3 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007US22604 | Priority number, date | US20060862840P | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 862840 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008057235 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2089051 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089051 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K5/00, C12N15/00, A61K39/39, A61P35/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
C07H5/04 (US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07H15/00 (US);
C07H15/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | A61K39/00, C07K5/00, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE IMMUNOGENITÄT VON TUMORASSOZIIERTEN ANTIGENEN MITTELS ZUGABE VON ALPHA-GAL-EPITOPEN | [2009/34] | English: | ENHANCED IMMUNOGENICITY OF TUMOR ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS BY ADDITION OF ALPHAGAL EPITOPES | [2009/34] | French: | AUGMENTATION DE L'IMMUNOGENICITE DES ANTIGENES ASSOCIES AUX TUMEURS PAR L'ADJONCTION D'EPITOPES GAL | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2007 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - LATEMPLE D C ET AL, "Increased immunogenicity of tumor vaccines complexed with anti-Gal: studies in knockout mice for alpha1,3galactosyltransferase", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19990715), vol. 59, no. 14, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3417 - 3423, XP002596033 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3421, column r, paragraph 3 * | [I] - OLIVIER MANCHES ET AL, "Anti-Gal-mediated targeting of human B lymphoma cells to antigen-presenting cells: a potential method for immunotherapy using autologous tumor cells.", HAEMATOLOGICA, (20050501), vol. 90, no. 5, pages 625 - 634, XP055025927 [I] 1-14 * abstract * | [I] - URI GALILI, "Autologous tumor vaccines processed to express ?-gal epitopes: a practical approach to immunotherapy in cancer", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, (20041101), vol. 53, no. 11, doi:10.1007/s00262-004-0524-x, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 935 - 945, XP055025920 [I] 1-14 * page 942, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-004-0524-x | [I] - ABDEL-MOTAL USSAMA ET AL, "Increased immunogenicity of human immunodeficiency virus gp120 engineered to express Gal alpha 1-3Ga1 beta 1-4GlcNAc-R epitopes", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20060701), vol. 80, no. 14, doi:10.1128/JVI.00310-06, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6943 - 6951, XP002543575 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00310-06 | [A] - KANNAN P. NAICKER ET AL, "Design and synthesis of alphaGal-conjugated peptide T20 as novel antiviral agent for HIV-immunotargeting", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20040301), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.1039/b313844e, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 660 - 664, XP055025921 [A] 1-14 * page 661, column r, paragraph l - page 662, column r, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B313844E | [A] - DURRANT L G, "CANCER VACCINES", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US; NL, (19970101), vol. 8, no. 8, doi:10.1097/00001813-199709000-00001, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 727 - 733, XP000929776 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-199709000-00001 | [A] - MITCHELL M S, "CANCER VACCINES, A CRITCAL REVIEW - PART II", CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, PHARMAPRESS, US, (20020101), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1472-4472, pages 150 - 158, XP009009457 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - CEBON J ET AL, "IMMUNOTHERAPY OF MELANOMA: TARGETING DEFINED ANTIGENS", AUSTRALASIAN JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, AUSTRALIAN COLLEGE OF DERMATOLOGISTS, SYDNEY, AU, (19970601), vol. 38, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0004-8380, pages S66 - S72, XP009039025 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - GALILI U. ET AL., "Intratumoral injection of alpha-gel glycolipids induces xenograft-like destruction and conversion of lesions into endogenous vaccines", J. IMMUNOL., (200704), vol. 178, no. 7, pages 4676 - 4687, XP008109150 | [A] - GALILU U., "The alpha-gal epitope and the anti-Gal antibody in xenotransplantation and in cancer immunotherapy", IMMUNOL. CELL BIOL., (200512), vol. 83, no. 6, pages 674 - 686, XP008085470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1440-1711.2005.01366.x | [A] - ROSSI ET AL., "Effective treatment of preexisting melanoma with whole cell vaccines expressing alpha(1,3)-galactosyl epitopes", CANCER RES., (200511), vol. 65, no. 22, pages 10555 - 10561, XP008109151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-0627 |