EP2104681 - A GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN OPTIMIZED FOR EXPRESSION WITH SELF-CLEAVING POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inseron, Inc. Howard Hughes Center 6080 Center Drive, 6th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Inseron, Inc. Howard Hughes Center 6080 Center Drive, 6th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | ||
For all designated states Lacoste, Arnaud 500 63rd Street, Apt. 17G New York, NY 10021 / US | |||
For all designated states Mizrahi, Neptune 2222 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1405 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACOSTE, Arnaud 18 Whitney Avenue, nr. 17 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
MIZRAHI, Neptune 2222 Avenue of the Stars Suite 1405 Los Angeles, California 90067 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
LACOSTE, Arnaud 500 63rd Street Apt. 17G New York, NY 10021 / US | ||
02 /
MIZRAHI, Neptune 2222 Avenue of the Stars Suite 1405 Los Angeles, California 90067 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2009/40] | Miles, John Stephen Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07868067.5 | 28.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007US26389 | Priority number, date | US20070879112P | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 879112 P | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008085502 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104681 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07H21/02 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/43504 (EP,US);
C07K14/43595 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | FÜR DIE EXPRESSION MIT SELBSTSPALTENDEN POLYPEPTIDEN OPTIMIERTES GRÜNFLUORESZIERENDES PROTEIN | [2009/40] | English: | A GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN OPTIMIZED FOR EXPRESSION WITH SELF-CLEAVING POLYPEPTIDES | [2009/40] | French: | PROTÉINE FLUORESCENTE VERTE OPTIMISÉE POUR EXPRESSION PAR POLYPEPTIDES À AUTOCLIVAGE | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 06.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9623810 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract and claims* | [A] - CUBITT A B ET AL, "Understanding, improving and using green fluorescent proteins", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARDS, GB, (19951101), vol. 20, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0968-0004(00)89099-4, ISSN 0968-0004, pages 448 - 455, XP004222335 [A] 1-16 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0004(00)89099-4 | [A] - HEIM R ET AL, "ENGINEERING GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN FOR IMPROVED BRIGHTNESS, LONGER WAVELENGTHS AND FLUROESCENCE RESONANCE ENERGY TRANSFER", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, (19960201), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00450-5, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 178 - 182, XP000676582 [A] 1-16 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00450-5 | International search | [A]US5491084 (CHALFIE MARTIN [US], et al) |