EP2068907 - GLYCEROL LINKED PEGYLATED SUGARS AND GLYCOPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2017/24] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFREES, Shawn 126 Filly Drive North Wales, PA 19454 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Xiao 1863 Fox Run Terrace Warrington, PA 18976 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2010/01] | Engelhard, Markus, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80366 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07868373.7 | 04.10.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US80471 | Priority number, date | US20060828208P | 04.10.2006 Original published format: US 828208 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060780 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068907 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068907 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C07K16/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/96 (EP,US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/10 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | A61K38/16, A61K47/48 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | A61K38/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIT GLYCERIN VERBUNDENE PEGYLIERTE ZUCKER UND GLYCOPEPTIDE | [2009/25] | English: | GLYCEROL LINKED PEGYLATED SUGARS AND GLYCOPEPTIDES | [2009/25] | French: | GLYCOPEPTIDES ET SUCRES PEGYLES À LIAISON GLYCEROL | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 29.11.2017 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/28] | MC | 29.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005072371 (NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0068] , [0148] , [0149]; figures 2,3,5 *; | [Y]WO2006082517 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 3a, 4c, 4i *; | [A] - DEFREES S ET AL, "GlycoPEGylation of recombinant therapeutic proteins produced in Escherichia coli", GLYCOBIOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20060901), vol. 16, no. 9, doi:10.1093/GLYCOB/CWL004, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 833 - 843, XP002403450 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwl004 | International search | [X]US7125843 (DEFREES SHAWN [US], et al) | Examination | WO2005051327 | WO2007056191 | - C. NEGRIER ET AL, "Enhanced pharmacokinetic properties of a glycoPEGylated recombinant factor IX: a first human dose trial in patients with hemophilia B", BLOOD, US, (20110908), vol. 118, no. 10, doi:10.1182/blood-2011-02-335596, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2695 - 2701, XP055265689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2011-02-335596 | - P. W. COLLINS ET AL, "Recombinant long-acting glycoPEGylated factor IX in hemophilia B: a multinational randomized phase 3 trial", BLOOD, (20141218), vol. 124, no. 26, doi:10.1182/blood-2014-05-573055, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3880 - 3886, XP055173746 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2014-05-573055 | by applicant | US4235871 | US4412989 | US4438253 | US4501728 | US4522811 | US4603044 | WO8705330 | US4826945 | US4837028 | US4897268 | US4957773 | WO9013540 | US5075109 | US5122614 | WO9216640 | US5183660 | US5202413 | US5219564 | WO9315189 | US5281698 | WO9404193 | WO9409027 | US5324844 | WO9415625 | WO9417039 | WO9418247 | US5342940 | US5352670 | US5374541 | US5410016 | US5446090 | US5529914 | WO9621469 | US5545553 | WO9632491 | US5605793 | US5643575 | US5672662 | US5716812 | US5728554 | WO9815581 | WO9831826 | US5811238 | US5830721 | US5837458 | US5876980 | WO9914259 | US5919455 | US5922577 | WO9934833 | US5932462 | WO9945964 | US6030815 | US6113906 | WO0209766 | US6348558 | US6376604 | US6399336 | US6440703 | WO03031464 | US2004063911 | WO2004033651 | US2004132640 | US2004137557 | WO2004083259 | WO2004083258 | WO2004099231 | WO2005051327 | WO2005072371 | US2006040856 | WO2006082517 | US7125843 | - DEFREES ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 16, pages 833 - 843 | - NADANO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 11550 - 11557 | - KANAMORI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 21811 - 21819 | - VARKI, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 2, pages 25 - 40 | - SPATOLA, A. F., CHEMISTRY AND BIOCHEMISTRY OF AMINO ACIDS, PEPTIDES AND PROTEINS, MARCEL DEKKER, (1983), page 267 | - FA CROMMELIN AND RD SINDELAR,, Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, HARWOOD PUBLISHERS, (1997), pages 101 - 120 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - VERONESE, APP. BIOCHEM. BIOTECH, (1985), vol. 11, pages 141 - 45 | - HARRIS, MACRONOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1985), vol. C25, pages 325 - 373 | - SCOUTEN, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), vol. 135, pages 30 - 65 | - WONG ET AL., ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (1992), vol. 14, pages 866 - 874 | - DELGADO ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1992), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - ZALIPSKY, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1995), vol. 6, pages 150 - 165 | - BHADRA ET AL., PHARMAZIE, (2002), vol. 57, pages 5 - 29 | - KODERA Y., BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 283 - 288 | - YAMASAKI ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM, (1998), vol. 52, pages 2125 - 2127 | - DUNN ET AL.,, "POLYMERIC DRUGS AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS", ACS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 469 | - YOUNES ET AL., JBIOMED. MATER. RES, (1987), vol. 21, pages 1301 - 1316 | - COHN ET AL., JBIOMED. MATER. RES, (1988), vol. 22, pages 993 - 1009 | - SAWHNEY ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1993), vol. 26, pages 581 - 587 | - "MODIFICATION OF PROTEINS", FEENEY ET AL., Advances in Chemistry Series, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1982), vol. 198 | - ELHALABI ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 6, page 93 | - SCHAFER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2000), vol. 65, page 24 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - HAKIMUDDIN ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, page 52 | - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 118, page 131 | - THOTAKURA, METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 350 | - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. B ., (1981), pages 259 - 306 | - ITO ET AL., PURE APPL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 65, page 753 | - PAULSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1978), vol. 253, pages 5617 - 5624 | - URDAL ET AL., J. CHROMATOG, (1984), vol. 296, page 171 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | WO2002US32263 | US20030360770 | US20030369979 | US20030410913 | US20030410945 | WO2005US02522 | US20050665588 |