EP2080114 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLAYBACK OF DIGITAL MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Slacker, INC. 16935 W. Bernado Dr. Suite 101 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINDIG, Bradley D. 9325 Laurentian Dr. San Diego, California 92129 / US | 02 /
MILBRANDT, Celite 5920 Northwest Place Austin, TX 78731 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
KINDIG, Bradley D. 9325 Laurentian Dr. San Diego, California 92129 / US | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07868561.7 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US82373 | Priority number, date | US20060862736P | 24.10.2006 Original published format: US 862736 P | US20070886283P | 23.01.2007 Original published format: US 886283 P | [2009/32] |
Former [2009/30] | US20060862763P | 24.10.2006 | |
US20070886283P | 23.01.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008052050 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080114 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G11B27/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
H04H20/106 (EP,US);
G06F16/13 (US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/436 (EP,US);
G06F16/437 (EP,US);
H04N21/4126 (EP,US);
H04N21/41422 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4825 (EP,US);
H04N21/4826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERGABE DIGITALER MEDIENINHALTE | [2009/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLAYBACK OF DIGITAL MEDIA CONTENT | [2009/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA NUMÉRIQUE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 25.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2343053 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 24, line 7; figures 1-16; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US2002199194 (ALI KAMAL [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2004001690 (BOSTON STEPHEN B [US], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-30; claims 1-20 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0172] * [A] 8-14; | [XA]US2005114794 (GRIMES TOM [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * the whole document * [A] 8-14; | [E]US7884274 (WIEDER JAMES W [US]) [E] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-12; claims 1-48 ** column 8, line 48 - column 24, line 43 * | International search | [X]US2004220926 (LAMKIN ALLAN B [US], et al); | [Y]US2006112082 (PLATT JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2006206493 (LIPSCOMB KENNETH O [US], et al) | by applicant | GB2343053 | US2002199194 | US2004220926 |