EP2076985 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTENT SCRAMBLING IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verizon Patent and Licensing Inc. One Verizon Way Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2012/29] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Verizon Services Organization Inc. 600 Hidden Ridge Irving, TX 75038 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07868584.9 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007US82576 | Priority number, date | US20060588065 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 588065 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008052141 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076985 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, H04N7/16, H04H60/23 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04L9/0631 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/26606 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04L2209/30 (EP,US);
H04L2209/601 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INHALTSVERSCHLÜSSELUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/28] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTENT SCRAMBLING IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2009/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À L'EMBROUILLAGE DE CONTENU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 18.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9718654 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 25 * * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 17 *; | [A]WO0076118 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line l *; | [A]US2001033656 (GLIGOR VIRGIL DORIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0128] , [0129] *; | [A]WO2006086554 (SINETT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0022] *; | [Y] - SCHNEIER B, "Applied Cryptography, protocols, algorithms amd source code in C, second edition, 2.3 ONE-WAY FUNCTIONS", APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY, XX, XX, (19951018), pages 29 - 31,193, XP002224472 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [09.3] * | [A] - MENEZES A ET AL, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY; [CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS], CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, PAGE(S) 223 - 282, (19970101), ISBN 978-0-8493-8523-0, XP002209334 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [7.2.2] * | International search | [Y]US2004247126 (MCCLELLAN STANLEY ARCHER [US]); | [Y]US6028933 (HEER DANIEL N [US], et al); | [Y]US2004228401 (CHEN SHERMAN XUEMIN [US]) | Examination | US5345508 |