EP2091455 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A NON-CONTINUOUS CIRCUMFERENTIAL TREATMENT TO A BODY LUMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l. 102 rue des Maraîchers 2124 Luxembourg / LU | [2015/02] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l. 102 rue des Maraîchers 2124 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Ardian, Inc. 1810a Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMARAIS, Denise 15403 Shannon Road Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
GIFFORD, Hanson 3180 Woodside Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 03 /
ZADNO, Nicolas 47066 Palo Amarillo Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 04 /
DEEM, Mark 685 Sierra Drive Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Benjamin J. 498 Alameda De Las Pulgas Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 06 /
WU, Andrew 506 Gibraltor Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 07 /
MICHLITSCH, Kenneth J. 822 South M Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Donald, Jenny Susan Forresters Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07868755.5 | 14.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US84708 | Priority number, date | US20060599890 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: US 599890 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008061152 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2091455 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091455 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61N1/32 (EP,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (US);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/0016 (US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00404 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00434 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00511 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00648 (US);
A61B2018/00791 (US);
A61B2018/00875 (US);
A61B2018/124 (US);
A61B2018/1435 (US);
A61B2018/1465 (US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/327 (EP,US);
A61N7/022 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER NICHT KONTINUIERLICHEN UMFANGSBEHANDLUNG EINES KÖRPERLUMENS | [2009/35] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A NON-CONTINUOUS CIRCUMFERENTIAL TREATMENT TO A BODY LUMEN | [2009/35] | French: | MÉTHODES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UN TRAITEMENT CIRCONFÉRENTIEL NON CONTINU SUR UNE LUMIÈRE CORPORELLE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 28.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Observations by third parties | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13159256.0 / EP2623060 | EP13159257.8 / EP2623061 | EP13159259.4 / EP2623062 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2015
14.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/47] | 16.11.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2017 | 20.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 27.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T0643/19 | 25.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2007 | AT | 07.01.2015 | BE | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | GB | 14.11.2015 | LU | 14.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IT | 14.11.2021 | [2023/10] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 14.11.2007 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 14.11.2007 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9942047 (CONWAY STUART MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2006041881 (ARDIAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0033] , [0040] - [0043] - [0077] , [0078] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0083] - [0087]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0095] - [00100]; figures 8, 9 * * paragraphs [00135] - [00143]; figures 24A-B * [I] 9,10,13 | International search | [X]US5470352 (RAPPAPORT CAREY M [US]); | [A]US6254598 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al); | [X]US6258087 (EDWARDS STUART [US], et al) | Examination | US2002087156 |