EP2092014 - POLYPROPYLENE BLOWN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIER, Rodolfo 4839 Roaring Springs Road Pasadena, TX 77505 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Mark 1906 Walnut Green Houston, TX 77062 / US | 03 /
MCBRIDE, Raleigh 1413 Tonkawa Deer Park, TX 77536 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Reseach Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Selg, Peter Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Patent Department Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 07869268.8 | 14.12.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US87525 | Priority number, date | US20060875204P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 875204 P | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008079733 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092014 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/00, B32B27/32, C08F110/06, C08J5/18 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/00 (KR);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | C08L23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLEN-BLASFOLIE | [2009/35] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE BLOWN FILM | [2009/35] | French: | PELLICULE SOUFFLÉE DE POLYPROPYLÈNE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 10.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2006004167 (TAU LI-MIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2006009586 (AGUIRRE JUAN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2006147663 (BARRE VINCENT H [US], et al); | [Y]US2006199884 (HOENIG STEPHEN M [US], et al) |