EP2106553 - DIFFERENTIAL CAPACITIVE SENSOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNEIL, Andrew, C. 2163 E. Carla Vista Place Chandler, Arizona 85225 / US | 02 /
LIN, Yizhen 1038 South Oak Street Gilbert, Arizona 85233 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Todd, F. 5906 E. Evening Glow Dr. Scottsdale, Arizona 85262 / US | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes, et al Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes Freescale Semiconductor Inc c/o Impetus IP Ltd Groove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07869403.1 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007US87846 | Priority number, date | US20070655557 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: US 655557 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008088644 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106553 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2106553 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/125 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P2015/0831 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | G01R27/26, G01P15/13 | ||
Former IPC [2009/41] | G01R27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER DIFFERENZIALSENSOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/41] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL CAPACITIVE SENSOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2009/41] | French: | CAPTEUR CAPACITIF DIFFÉRENTIEL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 01.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2007 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | IE | 18.12.2012 | LU | 18.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 18.12.2007 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
LU | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
LU | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004160232 (YUE AIWU [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] * * figures 2-3 *; | [Y]FR2694403 (SAGEM [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * page 4, line 21 - line 27; figures 2,4 * | International search | [Y]US2005109109 (ESKRIDGE MARK H [US], et al); | [Y]US7119550 (KITANO MAYO [JP], et al); | [A]US2005145029 (STEWART ROBERT E [US]) | by applicant | US2004160232 | FR2694403 |