EP2097091 - CONJUGATE OF NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE AND ANTIBODY CONSTANT REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CardioPep Pharma GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Strasse 23 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Cardiopep Pharma GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Strasse 23 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states PDL BioPharma, Inc. 1400 Seaport Blvd. Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHASKAR, Vinay 1712 Castro Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 02 /
DUBRIDGE, Robert Bryan 825 Holly Road Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 03 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Vanitha 825 Holly Road Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
JANTZEN, Hans-Michael 350 Church Street, Apt. H San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07869671.3 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007US88404 | Priority number, date | US20060876913P | 21.12.2006 Original published format: US 876913 P | US20070960427 | 19.12.2007 Original published format: US 960427 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008079995 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097091 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/24, C07H21/04 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C07K14/58 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | KONJUGAT AUS EINEM NATRIURETISCHEN PEPTID UND DER KONSTANTEN DOMÄNE EINES ANTIKÖRPERS | [2009/37] | English: | CONJUGATE OF NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE AND ANTIBODY CONSTANT REGION | [2009/37] | French: | CONJUGUÉ COMPRENANT UN PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE ET UNE RÉGION CONSTANTE D'UN ANTICORPS | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 17.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005047334 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph L * * page 26, line 19 - line 26 * * page 27, line 14 - line 24 * * page 28, line 6 - line 14 * * page 30, line 18 *; | [X]WO2006107124 (HANMI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 8, line 3 - line 19 * * page 9, line 12 - line 21 * * page 19, line 12 - line 18 * * page 24, line 7 - page 25, line 15 * * page 26, line 21 - page 27, line 7 * * page 28, line 16; claims 21-23 *; | [XY]WO2005007809 (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-11,13 * page 21, paragraph L - page 22, paragraph 1 * * claims 27,28 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]US2006074009 (JAMES KENNETH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0012] , [0015] , [0016] , [0048] , [0067] , [0080] , [0145] , [0146] , [0299] , [0301] *; | [A]DE19535445 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document * * claims 5,6 * | [Y] - FORSSMANN W-G ET AL, "THE RENAL URODILATIN SYSTEM: CLINICAL IMPLICATIONS", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (20010815), vol. 51, no. 3, ISSN 0008-6363, pages 450 - 462, XP001098418 [Y] 14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6363(01)00331-5 | International search | [X] - MITROVIC ET AL., "Haemodynamic and clinical effects of ularitidie in decompensated heart failure", EUROP. HEART JOURNAL, (2006), vol. 27, pages 2823 - 2832, XP008109844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehl337 | [Y] - KENNY ET AL., "Hydrolysis of human and pig brain natriuretic peptides, urodilatin, C-type natiuretic peptide and some C-receptor ligands by endopeptidase-24.11", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 291, pages 83 - 88, XP008109843 | [Y] - LOW S.C. ET AL., "Oral and pulmonary delivery of FSH-Fc fusion proteins via neonatal Fc receptor-mediated transcytosis", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (2005), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1805 - 1813, XP002455704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/deh896 |