EP2118336 - METHOD OF CURING METAL ALKOXIDE-CONTAINING FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROBEL, Mark, A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ULSH, Michael, J. 3753 Rabbit Mountain Road Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | 03 /
LYONS, Christopher, S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
INVIE, Judith, M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2017/07] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
STROBEL, Mark, A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
ULSH, Michael, J. 3753 Rabbit Mountain Road Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | |||
03 /
LYONS, Christopher, S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
INVIE, Judith, M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2009/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07870070.5 | 28.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007US89098 | Priority number, date | US20060882625P | 29.12.2006 Original published format: US 882625 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008083310 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118336 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118336 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/18, C23C16/56, B05D3/08, C23C14/56, C23C14/58, C23C16/54 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
C23C16/56 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/08 (EP,KR,US);
B05D5/083 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/562 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/5853 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/18 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | C23C16/448, C23C16/02, C23C16/18, C23C16/56, C23C28/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HÄRTUNG VON FILMEN, DIE METAL-ALKOXIDE ENTHALTEN | [2017/04] | English: | METHOD OF CURING METAL ALKOXIDE-CONTAINING FILMS | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DURCISSEMENT DE FILMS CONTENANT UN ALCOXYDE MÉTALLIQUE | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/47] | VERFAHREN ZUM HÄRTEN VON METALLALKOXID ENTHALTENDEN FILMEN | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2007 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.12.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.12.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.12.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4732879 (KALINOWSKI MARIE R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,13,14,17,25 * column 4, line 13 - line 26; example 8; claims 1-15 *; | [Y]WO0103856 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [Y] 1-9,13,14,17,25 * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 5 * * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 31; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO0116044 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-6,13,14,17,25 * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 5; claims 1-18; table 1 * |