EP2097405 - ANTI-VIRAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Smithkline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza PO Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIVERS, Martin Robert 91 Central Ave. 103 San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Franz Ulrich 544 Marin Avenue Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Christopher Don 1160 Granada St. Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
DEHGHANI MOHAMMAD ABADI, Ali 4971 Ponderosa Terrace Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Crawley, Karen Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Crawley, Karen Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07871535.6 | 20.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007US85218 | Priority number, date | US20060860614P | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 860614 P | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008070447 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097405 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D207/09, C07D417/14, C07D401/14, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D413/04 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/08 (EP,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Extension states | HR | 05.06.2009 | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE VERBINDUNGEN | [2009/37] | English: | ANTI-VIRAL COMPOUNDS | [2009/37] | French: | COMPOSÉS ANTI-VIRAUX | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1604989 (SANTHERA PHARMACEUTICALS DEUTS [DE]) [X] 1-33 * scheme H; example 17, step 1 *; | [X]US5977101 (ALI FADIA EL-FEHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * examples 43a,44a *; | [X]JP2001247569 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [X] 1-33 * page 42, compound 135; pages 47-48, compounds 163, 164, 167 *; | [X]WO03057667 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * figure 5, compound 38; example 6 *; | [X]US2006074071 (MELIKIAN ANITA [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * example 25 *; | [PX]WO2007077186 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-33 * compounds E-4, F-4, K-3; page 39, line 2 from bottom; page 40, 3 last lines; examples 6, 14-26, 39, 45-48, 55, 72, 75-79, 96 *; | [PX]WO2007106192 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-33 * scheme 3, compounds e; scheme 5, compounds d; scheme 7, compounds e; examples 9d, 10c, 11c, 12c *; | [PX]WO2007070600 (GENELABS TECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2008021936 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [E] 1 * example -; claims 1,19,20,26 *; | [X]US5948793 (ABREO MELWYN A [US], et al) [X] 1 * reaction scheme I, compounds 3; examples 2a, 14a, 15b, 17a, 18a, 74a, 74b, ... *; | [X]WO0200631 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * preparation 42 *; | [X]WO9741119 (REDDY RESEARCH FOUNDATION [IN], et al) [X] 1 * preparation 10; example 6;; claims 1,9,17,18 *; | [X]US6660759 (HATTORI KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * preparations 5, 10 *; | [X]US2006116515 (GAHMAN TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [X] 1 * examples 3e,89g,89h,89i,137a,140a,140b,140c,...; claims 1,51 *; | [X]US4801604 (VONVOIGTLANDER PHILIP F [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 9A *; | [X]WO2006117669 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1 * general procedures G7, G8, G14a-c;;; examples 4-8,44,57,62,73,84,92,...; claims 1,4,7,9 *; | [X]US5707987 (NAKAGAWA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * reference examples 100(7), 101(2),103(5), 104(8), 109(5), ... * | [X] - KAZUYUKI MAEKAWA AND JIRO OHTANI, "Synthese von 2-(1'-Amino-1'-substituiertem alkyl)-benzimidazol aus Aminosäuren und ihre biologische Aktivität", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1976), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 791 - 799, XP008069983 [X] 1-33 * table 1, entry 6; table 3, entry 16 (Z-Pro*-) * | [X] - GHOTAS EVINDAR AND ROBERT A. BATEY, "Parallel synthesis of a library of benzoxazoles and benzothiazoles using ligand-accelerated copper-catalyzed cyclizations of ortho-halobenzanilides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 71, no. 5, pages 1802 - 1808, XP002508116 [X] 1-33 * table 3, entries 23, 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO051927Q | [X] - ROGER JOYEAU ET AL, "Synthesis and activity of pyrrolidinyl- and thiazolidinyl-dipeptide derivatives as inhibitors of the Tc80 prolyl oligopeptidase from Trypanosoma cruzi", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 257 - 266, XP004330419 [X] 1-33 * compound 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(00)00118-5 | [X] - BRIAN K. ALBRECHT AND ROBERT M. WILLIAMS, "A concise formal total synthesis of TMC-95A/B proteasome inhibitors", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2003), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 197 - 200, XP002508117 [X] 1-33 * scheme 1, 13 -> 14; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OL0272545 | [DA] - ZHI-JIE NI AND ALLAN S. WAGMAN, "Progress and development of small molecule HCV antivirals", CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY & DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1367-6733, pages 446 - 459, XP009037092 [DA] 1-33 * the whole document * |