EP2121417 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A STEERING ANGLE OFFSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | For all designated states Continental AG Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Continental AG Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELL, Andreas Herrnhüttestrasse 33 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
GROTENDORST, Jörg Felix-Dahn-Strasse 13a 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/48] | Application number, filing date | 07871771.7 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007DE02298 | Priority number, date | DE20071002708 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007002708 | [2009/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086767 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121417 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121417 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/00, B62D15/02 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B62D15/0245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINES LENKWINKELOFFSETS | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A STEERING ANGLE OFFSET | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UN DÉCALAGE D'ANGLE DE BRAQUAGE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 07.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | IE | 02.06.2010 | IT | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | MT | 02.06.2010 | NL | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | ES | 13.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | LU | 20.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 02.06.2010 | |
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 02.06.2010 | |
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CZ | 02.06.2010 | |
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 02.06.2010 | |
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 02.06.2010 | |
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003212476 (AANEN ARIE G [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0117]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2004024565 (YU JINGSHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004061500 (LOU YONGLE [US], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US2004117088 (DILGER FRITZ P E [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-4 * |