EP2054081 - JC VIRUS VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute Suite 125, 3434 Live Oak Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLAND, Clement, Richard 2214 Allen Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07872285.7 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US77397 | Priority number, date | US20060841393P | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 841393 P | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008091398 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054081 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF GEGEN DEN JC-VIRUS | [2009/19] | English: | JC VIRUS VACCINE | [2009/19] | French: | VACCIN CONTRE LE VIRUS JC | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 16.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/31] | 19.03.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP12159167.1 / EP2465532 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ALTSCHULER E L, "Viral Inoculation for Prophylaxis of polyoma virus associated diseases", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, EDEN PRESS, PENRITH, US LNKD- DOI:10.1054/MEHY.2000.1280, vol. 56, no. 1, ISSN 0306-9877, (20010101), pages 24 - 25, (20001208), XP008102922 [X] 1,17 * the whole document * [I] 2-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/mehy.2000.1280 | [A] - REST STUDY TEAM, "Safety and efficacy of a pentavalent human-bovine (WC3) reassortant rotavirus vaccine", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (200601), vol. 354, no. 1, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 23 - 33, XP002585724 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - BOLAND C RICHARD, "Evidence for an association between JC virus and colorectal neoplasia", CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY BIOMARKERS & PREVENTION, (200412), vol. 13, no. 12, ISSN 1055-9965, pages 2285 - 2286, XP002585725 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [L] - N. Meyers, "JC Virus", (2010), Baylor research Institute, URL: http://www.baylorhealth.edu/Research/TechTransfer/IPLists/po_jcvirusbhcs1027.htm, (20100604), XP002585726 [L] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5750110 (PRIEELS JOHN PAUL [BE], et al); | [Y]US6238859 (LUEKE WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [Y] - ALTSCHULER L., "Viral Inoculation for Prophylaxis of polyoma virus associated diseases", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, (2001), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 24 - 25, XP008102922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/mehy.2000.1280 | [Y] - MURDIN ET AL., "Poliovirus Hybrids Expressing Neutralization Epitopes from Variable Domains I and IV of the Major Outer Membrane Protein of Chlamydia trachomatis Elicit Broadly Cross-Reactive C. trachomatis-Neutralizing Antibodies", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 1116 - 1121, XP008102787 |