EP2084234 - POLYMERIC COATINGS THAT INACTIVATE VIRUSES AND BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. HALDAR, Jayanta 100 Lexington Street Apt A3 Belmont MA02478 / US | 02 /
AN, Deqiang 252 Massachusetts Avenue, Apartment 4 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
Dr. ALVAREZ DE CIENFUEGO, Luis Calle Belen 12 18009 Granada / ES | 04 /
CHEN, Jianzhu 17 Stearns Road, No. 6 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 05 /
KLIBANOV, Alexander, M. 85 East India Row, Apartment 23A Boston, MA 02110 / US | [2009/36] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
HALDAR, Jayanta 109 Cushing Street, Apartment 1 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | ||
02 /
AN, Deqiang 252 Massachusetts Avenue, Apartment 4 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
03 /
ALVAREZ DE CIENFUEGO, Luis 212 West Springfield Street Boston, MA 02118 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Jianzhu 17 Stearns Road, No. 6 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
05 /
KLIBANOV, Alexander, M. 85 East India Row, Apartment 23A Boston, MA 02110 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07873605.5 | 08.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US84149 | Priority number, date | US20060864967P | 08.11.2006 Original published format: US 864967 P | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008127416 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2084234 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/14, A01N25/10, C09D201/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
A01N25/10 (EP,US);
A01N33/04 (EP,US);
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
A01N37/18 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERE BESCHICHTUNGEN ZUR DEAKTIVIERUNG VON VIREN UND BAKTERIEN | [2009/32] | English: | POLYMERIC COATINGS THAT INACTIVATE VIRUSES AND BACTERIA | [2009/32] | French: | ENDUITS POLYMÈRES INACTIVANT LES VIRUS ET LES BACTÉRIES | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006071191 (APPEARTEX AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,11,14 * examples 1,2 * * page 4, line 19 - line 37 * * page 8, line 22 - line 27 * * page 23, line 36 - page 24, line 5 * * page 27 *; | [PX]WO2006117382 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,11 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [X]JPH0912717 ; | [A]WO2004050132 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,15 * claims 1,8,9,12,19 *; | [A]WO0206380 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 12, Database accession no. 1997-128837, XP002498181 & JPH0912717 A 19970114 (MIYOSHI YUSHI KK) [X] 1,14 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2006071191 | JPH0912717 | WO2006117382 | - WOOD ET AL., NATURE REV MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 2, pages 842 - 847 | - WRIGHT ET AL., Fields Virology, LIPPINCOTT, (2001), pages 1533 - 1579 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2006), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 584 - 589 | - LüSCHER-MATTLI M, ARCH VIROL, (2000), vol. 145, pages 2233 - 2248 | - CUNLIFFE ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1999), vol. 65, pages 4995 - 5002 |