EP2095221 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND AUTHENTICATION OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verient, Inc. 1190 Saratoga Ave., 220 San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G. 1190 Saratoga Ave. No. 220 San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G. 20640 Oak Creek Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G. 1136 Derbyshire Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07873624.6 | 21.11.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007US85332 | Priority number, date | US20060562330 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 562330 | US20060562353 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 562353 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008127431 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2095221 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/04, G06F21/00, G07F7/10 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
G06Q20/385 (EP);
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/34 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06F2221/2111 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | G06F7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [2009/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND AUTHENTICATION OF A USER | [2009/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 11.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2013 | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | 16.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | Appeal following examination | 18.11.2013 | Appeal received No. T0439/14 | 27.01.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.02.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6000832 (FRANKLIN D CHASE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10 [I] 11-14; | [YA]US2002053035 (SCHUTZER DANIEL [US]) [Y] 7-10 * the whole document *[A] 1-6,11-15; | [XAY]WO03038719 (ARCOT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,15 * the whole document * [A] 11-14 [Y] 7-10; | [YA]US2004010685 (SAKAGUCHI HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,9-15; | [A]US2006124756 (BROWN KERRY D [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] *; | [XAYI] - E. R. Harold, "Virtual account numbers", (20060829), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060829000813/http://www.elharo.com/blog/privacy/2006/05/17/virtual-account-numbers/, (20100621), XP002588797 [X] 1-4,7,15 * the whole document * [A] 12-14 [Y] 7-10 [I] 5,11 | International search | [XY]US2006173781 (DONNER IRAH H [US]) [X] 1-5, 9-15, 18-23, 25-28, 31-43, 46-61, 63-78 * , entire document, especially Abstract, FIGS.20, 38 and 47; and para [0048], [0052], [0056], [0089], [0111], [0113], [0141], [0151], [0163], [0166], [0179], [0190]-[0191], [0211], [0218], [0228], [0248], [0258], [0282], [0287]-[0288], [0313]-[0314], [0328], [0358]-[0359], [0379], [0417], [0445]-[044 * [Y] 6-8, 16-17, 24, 29-30, 44- 45, 62; | [Y]US2006212407 (LYON DENNIS B [US]) [Y] 6-8, 16-17, 24, 29-30, 44- 45, 62 * , entire document, especially Abstract, FIGS.4 and 7B; and para [0002], [0111], (0126], [0131] and [0183] *; | [A]US2006177061 (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [A] 1-78 * entire document * | Examination | WO2006118968 | by applicant | US6000832 |