EP1944284 - Crystallisation method for creating bisphenol A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | 13.10.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münnich, Christian, Dr. Albrecht-Haushofer-Strasse 6 51377 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Blaschke, Ulrich, Dr. Lützowstrasse 8 47829 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Eek, Rob, Dr. Queensroad Central 99 Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
Prein, Michael, Dr. Heinrich-Klausmann-Strasse 1 47809 Krefeld / DE | 05 /
Audenaert, Raymond, Dr. Polderstraat 24 9220 Hamme / BE | 06 /
Tytgat, Gert Hoogstraat 182 2570 Duffel / BE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08000201.7 | 08.01.2008 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | DE20071001427 | 09.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007001427 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944284 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944284 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/20, C07C37/84 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C07C37/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C39/16 (KR);
C07C37/84 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (US,EP);
C07C37/84, C07C39/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | Kristallisationsverfahren zur Herstellung von Bisphenol A | [2008/29] | English: | Crystallisation method for creating bisphenol A | [2008/29] | French: | Procédé de cristallisation destiné à la fabrication de bisphénol A | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.2012
19.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/42] |
Former [2014/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.2012
19.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.2012
19.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.2012
19.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Terpsma, Jelle Philip, et al, et al Sabic Inovative Plastics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 NL-4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2012/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.03.2012
SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Grever, Frederik SABIC Innovative Plastics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 10.05.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.11.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.07.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/46] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 17.01.2013 | Appeal received No. T0115/14 | 19.03.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.07.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 20.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2008 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | NO | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | GB | 08.01.2012 | LU | 08.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | AT | 08.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 08.01.2012 | ||
LU | 08.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
AT | 08.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 08.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
AT | 08.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 08.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 08.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 08.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
NO | 29.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0671377 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1-4 ** claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP1728777 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * example 2 * * claims 1,10 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * | by applicant | US4391997 | US4400555 | US4590303 | EP0210366 | EP1268379 | EP1607380 |