EP1902779 - A support unit for a microfluidic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawazoe, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi Chemical Co Ltd Res. & Dev. Center 1500, Oaza Ogawa Shimodate-shi Ibaraki 308-8521 / JP | 02 /
Nakaso, Akishi c/o Hitachi Chemical Co Ltd Res. & Dev. Center 1500, Oaza Ogawa Shimodate-shi Ibaraki 308-8521 / JP | 03 /
Arike, Shigeharu c/o Hitachi Chemical Co Ltd Res. & Dev. Center 1500, Oaza Ogawa Shimodate-shi Ibaraki 308-8521 / JP | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08000280.1 | 25.02.2003 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | JP20020048580 | 25.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002048580 | JP20020292978 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002292978 | JP20030046414 | 24.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003046414 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1902779 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1902779 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902779 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B01L3/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B81B1/00 (KR);
B01J19/00 (KR);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01L3/00 (KR);
B81C1/00119 (EP,US);
B81C99/00 (KR);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00788 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00822 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00833 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0086 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00869 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0874 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
B81B2201/051 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Trägereinheit für ein mikrofluidisches System | [2008/13] | English: | A support unit for a microfluidic system | [2008/13] | French: | Unité de support pour système microfluide | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03707062.0 / EP1486455 | Divisional application(s) | EP10177308.3 / EP2255870 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030707062) is 14.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2003 | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | GB | 25.02.2012 | IE | 25.02.2012 | LU | 25.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
LU | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4959152 (NICHOLS RANDALL W [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-3; claims 1-29 *; | [Y]DE4308697 (DURST FRANZ PROF DR DR H C [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, line 8 - line 11; figures 1-9; claims 1-29 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 27 *; | [Y]GB2306643 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 7, line 1 - line 16; figures 1-4; claims 1-19 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 6 * * page 17, line 1 - line 6 *; | [Y]WO9800231 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-16* page 13, line 3 - line 9; figure 1; claims 1-97 *; | [Y]FR2813073 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 8 - line 17; figures 1-3; claims 1-16 * * page 2, line 29 - line 30 * * page 9, line 12 - line 20 * * page 11, line 3 - line 14 * | by applicant | US4959152 | DE4308697 | GB2306643 | WO9800231 | FR2813073 |