EP1946692 - Dishwasher and basket with coupling device for admission of cleaning and or desinfection agent and/or Drying air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dyck, Heinrich Heeper Strasse 387 33719 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Knorr, Jochen Friedhofstrasse 104 33659 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/30] | Application number, filing date | 08000347.8 | 10.01.2008 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | DE20071003894 | 19.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003894 | [2008/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1946692 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1946692 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946692 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A47L15/508 (EP);
A61B1/00128 (EP);
A61B1/123 (EP);
A61B1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spülmaschine und Spülgutträger mit einer Kupplungsvorrichtung zur Einleitung von Spül- und oder Desinfektionsflüssigkeit und/oder Trocknungsluft | [2008/30] | English: | Dishwasher and basket with coupling device for admission of cleaning and or desinfection agent and/or Drying air | [2008/30] | French: | Lave-vaisselle et panier avec système d'accouplement pour l'admission de produit de lavage et ou désinfectant et /ou d'air de séchage | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2008 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2508789 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1,10,13 * claim . * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO8301892 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1,10,13 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0796587 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,10,13 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 1, line 41 - line 50 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE19705548 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 10 * column 1, line 3 - line 12 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 39 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,13; | [A]DE102004022025 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,10,13 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 4, paragraph 22 * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP0483059 | EP0762587 | DE10300501 | DE10317150 |