EP1956113 - Plasma-enhanced ALD of tantalum nitride films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM America, Inc. 3440 East University Drive Phoenix, AZ 85034-7200 / US | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elers, Kai-Erik Lautamiehentie 2 B 42 Vantaa 01510 / FI | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08000724.8 | 16.01.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | US20070627749 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: US 627749 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956113 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, C23C16/30 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
C23C16/34 (EP,US);
C23C16/4554 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaunterstützte Atomlagenabscheidung von Tantalnitridfilmen | [2008/33] | English: | Plasma-enhanced ALD of tantalum nitride films | [2008/33] | French: | ALD amélioré au plasma de films au nitrure de tantale | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003219942 (CHOI KYUNG-IN [KR], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14-22,25 * paragraphs [0012] , [0019] - [0023] - [0036] - [0042] - [0056] , [0060]; figure 3D; claim 37 * [Y] 11,13; | [X]US7144806 (FAIR JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,14-18,21,22,25 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 56; figure 3; claims 1,7,9,12-20 * * column 8, lines 21-40; figure 5 *; | [X]WO2006093260 (ULVAC INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,14-25 * figures 1,5,7; examples 1-4 *; | [X]US2005095443 (KIM HYUNGJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,15-18,21-25 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0041] - [0043]; figures 3,5; example 1; claims 1,10,13 *; | [Y]WO03102265 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0035] *; | [Y] - PARK J-S ET AL, "Plasma-enhanced atomic layer deposition of Ta-N thin films", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (200201), vol. 149, no. 1, ISSN 0013-4651, pages C28 - C32, XP002268295 [Y] 13 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1423642 | by applicant | US6863727 | US2004231799 | US4058430 | US5711811 | US6511539 | WO9617107 | - "Growth Mechanisms and Dynamics", Handbook of Crystal Growth 3, ELSEVIER, (1994), pages 601 - 663 |