EP2081352 - Method for network controlled MobileIP-based flow management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martinstrasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration St. Martinstrasse 76 81541 mÜNCHEN / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Görg, Carmelita, Prof. Butlandskamp 5a 28357 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Pangboonyanon, Varaporn Buergermeister-Smidt-Str 31 28195 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Pittmann, Frank Götzstr. 51 12099 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Toseef, Umar Niedersachsendamm 58 28201 Bremen / DE | 05 /
Udugama, Asanga Im Hollergrund 15 28357 Bremen / DE | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001071.3 | 21.01.2008 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081352 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W4/00 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H04W60/005 (EP);
H04W80/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/13] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für netzwerkgesteuertes mobiles IP-basiertes Flussmanagement | [2009/30] | English: | Method for network controlled MobileIP-based flow management | [2009/30] | French: | Procédé de gestion de flux sur MobileIP contrôlé par réseau | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007048013 (STARENT NETWORKS CORP [US]; GIBBS ANDREW [US]; RADHAKRISHNAN SHAJI E [) [Y] 8,22-26 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 24 - page 6, paragraph 26 * * page 13 * | [X] - SOLIMAN QUALCOMM N MONTAVONT GET/ENST-B N FIKOURAS K KULADINITHI UNIVERSITY OF BREMEN H, "Flow Bindings in Mobile IPv6; draft-soliman-monami6-flow-binding-03.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20061023), no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015048545 [X] 1,2,14-16,18,20,21 * abstract * * page 17, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 18, paragraphs 2-5 * | [YA] - LAZARO O ET AL, "MULTINET: Enabler for Next Generation Pervasive Wireless Services", MOBILE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SUMMIT, 2007. 16TH IST, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1662-2, pages 1 - 5, XP031132425 [Y] 8,22-26 * abstract * * page 4 * [A] 1-7,9-21 | by applicant | - J. BOYLE ET AL., THE COPS (COMMON OPEN POLICY SERVICE) PROTOCOL, (200001), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/rfc2748 | - C. RIGNEY ET AL., REMOTE AUTHENTICATION DIAL IN USER SERVICE (RADIUS, URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/rfc2865 | - C. LARSSON ET AL., A FILTER RULE MECHANISM FOR MULTI-ACCESS MOBILE IPV6, (200610), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/wg/monami6/draft-mitsuya-monami6-flow- distribution-policy-04.txt | - S. DEERING; R. HINDEN, "Internet Protocol, Version 6 (IPv6) Specification", RFC 2460, (199812), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc2460.txt | - D. JOHNSON; C. PERKINS; J. ARKKO, "Mobility Support in IPv6", RFC 3775, (200406), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc3775.txt | - H. SOLIMAN ET AL., FLOW BINDINGS IN MOBILE IPV6, (200702), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/id/draft-soliman-monami6- flow-binding-04.txt | - R. WAKIKAWA ET AL., MULTIPLE CARE-OF ADDRESSES REGISTRATION, (200703), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-ietf-monami6- multiplecoa-02 | - C. RIGNEY ET AL., REMOTE AUTHENTICATION DIAL IN USER SERVICE (RADIUS, (200006), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/rfc2865 | - C. LARSSON ET AL., A FILTER RULE MECHANISM FOR MULTI-ACCESS MOBILE IPV6, (200610), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/wg/monami6/draft-mitsuya- monami6-flow-distribution-policy-04.txt |