EP1908437 - Longitudinally flexible stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDINOL LTD. Kiryat Atidim, Building. 3, 4th Floor Tel Aviv 61581 / IL | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinchasik, Gregory 6/143 Tsamarot St. Herzelia 46424 / IL | 02 /
Richter, Jacob 8 Anafa Street Ramat Hasharon 47226 / IL | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001226.3 | 28.02.2001 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | US20000516753 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: US 516753 | US20000202723P | 08.05.2000 Original published format: US 202723 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1908437 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1908437 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908437 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61F2/90 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91508 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91516 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | A61F2/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | LV | 23.01.2008 | MK | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | Title | German: | Längsflexibler Stent | [2008/15] | English: | Longitudinally flexible stent | [2008/15] | French: | Stent longitudinalement flexible | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 09.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01104468.2 / EP1129673 | EP02019617.6 / EP1295574 | Divisional application(s) | EP10012406.4 / EP2311409 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010104468) is 27.02.2002 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 12.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9835634 (JOMED IMPLANTATE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 2; figures 8-10 *; | [AD]US5807404 (RICHTER JACOB [IL]) [AD] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US4733665 | US4886062 | US5133732 | US5733303 | US5807404 | US5836964 | US5997973 |