EP1950510 - Expansion valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuto c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mogi, Takashi c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuto c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Mogi, Takashi c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Steinmeister, Helmut ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Steinmeister, Helmut Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001330.3 | 24.01.2008 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | JP20070015814 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007015814 | JP20070015815 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007015815 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1950510 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1950510 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1950510 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F25B41/335 (EP,US);
F25B2341/0683 (EP,US);
F25B2500/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2013/01] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Expansionsventil | [2008/31] | English: | Expansion valve | [2008/31] | French: | Vanne d'expansion | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 26.10.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12008545.1 / EP2573489 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003307372 (TGK CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]EP1179716 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1598581 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2002318037 (TGK CO LTD) [X] 4 * abstract * [I] 5 | by applicant | JP2002054861 |