EP2083486 - Electromagnetic shielding of a connector arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heini, Christoph c/o Harman Becker Automotive Systems Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | 02 /
Khaki, Pejman c/o Harman Becker Automotive Systems Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | 03 /
Seeman, Thomas c/o Harman Becker Automotive Systems Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001349.3 | 24.01.2008 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083486 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083486 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
H01R13/6582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Abschirmung einer Steckeranordnung | [2009/31] | English: | Electromagnetic shielding of a connector arrangement | [2009/31] | French: | Protection électromagnétique pour agencement de connecteur | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2008 | AT | 20.04.2011 | BE | 20.04.2011 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HR | 20.04.2011 | IT | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | MT | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | NO | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5014160 (MCCOY JR JOHN F [US]) [Y] 4-8,12* column 6, line 37 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1032090 (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13-16,23-26 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0015]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-8,12 | by applicant | EP1032090 |