EP1955885 - Vehicle driving system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Kohei c/o Hitachi Car Engineering Co.,Ltd. 2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Shin c/o Hitachi Car Engineering Co.,Ltd. 2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP | 03 /
Matsuzaki, Norikazu Hitachi 12th Floor,Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Takamune, Yuuichirou Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor,Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Ito, Masaru Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor,Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-8220 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Matias, Bruno M., et al Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001458.2 | 25.01.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | JP20070030527 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007030527 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955885 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1955885 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/52, B60W20/00, B60W10/08, B60W10/02 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/429 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/461 (EP,US);
B60L2240/465 (EP,US);
B60L2240/507 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2250/24 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,US);
B60L2270/145 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2300/18 (US);
B60W2510/02 (US);
B60W2510/0283 (EP,US);
B60W2510/081 (EP,US);
B60W2520/26 (EP,US);
B60W2710/081 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | B60K6/44, B60K6/38, B60K6/387 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2011/50] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugsteuerungssystem | [2008/33] | English: | Vehicle driving system | [2008/33] | French: | Système de conduite de véhicule | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004226763 (KIM JONG HUN [KR]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] *; | [X]EP1393952 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0096] *; | [X]US6321865 (KURIBAYASHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 11 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 17 * | by applicant | JP2001260716 |