EP1953954 - ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION DEVICE FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN A PROTECTED NETWORK AND AN UNPROTECTED NETWORK AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/32] | Encryption/decryption device for secure communications between a protected network and an unprotected network and associated methods | ||
[2015/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2015/52] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1024 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keefe, Richard John 56 Bolton Trail North Chili NY 14514 / US | 02 /
White, Robert Jeffery 5190 Britten Lane Ellicott City MD 20143 / US | 03 /
Dennis, Gary Roger 372 Red Spruce Lane Rochester NY 14616 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/04] |
Former [2008/32] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001722.1 | 30.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | US20070668591 | 30.01.2007 Original published format: US 668591 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953954 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953954 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953954 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/22, H04L29/06 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H04L63/0485 (EP,US);
H04L12/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NO, SE [2014/34] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verschlüsselungs-/Entschlüsselungsvorrichtung für sichere Kommunikationen zwischen einem geschützten und einem ungeschützten Netz sowie entsprechende Verfahren | [2015/52] | English: | ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION DEVICE FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN A PROTECTED NETWORK AND AN UNPROTECTED NETWORK AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2015/34] | French: | Dispositif de cryptage/décryptage pour communications sécurisées entre un réseau protégé et un réseau non protégé et procédés associés | [2015/52] |
Former [2008/32] | Verschlüsselungs-/Entschlüsselungsvorrichtung für sichere Kommunikationen zwischen einem geschützten und einem ungeschützten Netz sowie entsprechende Verfahren | ||
Former [2008/32] | Encryption/decryption device for secure communications between a protected network and an unprotected network and associated methods | ||
Former [2008/32] | Dispositif de cryptage/décryptage pour communications sécurisées entre un réseau protégé et un réseau non protégé et procédés associés | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 23.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.01.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | [2016/39] |
Former [2016/35] | NO | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2357019 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-10 * page 10, line 21 - page 19, line 15 * * page 22, line 8 - page 24, line 19 * * page 35, line 12 - page 37, line 13 * * page 40, line 4 - page 41, line 5; figures 1-3,7,11; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2003028650 (CHEN YIHSIU [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1,2; claims 1,5-24 *; | [A]WO2004114047 (NOKIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 10 - page 11, line 8; figures 1B, 4-7 ** page 15, line 13 - page 17, line 18; claims 1,6-15,19 *; | [I]US2005058122 (ANSPACH STEVE S [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1,3,4; claims 1,9,10,18,20 *; | [A] - MIRHAKKAK M ET AL, "Modeling and Simulation of Haipe", MILCOM 2006 : WASHINGTON, DC, 23 - 25 OCTOBER 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ : IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, US, (20061023), ISBN 978-1-4244-0617-3, pages 1 - 7, XP031331737 [A] 1-10 * page 2, column l, line 18 - page 5, column r, line 4; figures 1-8 * |