EP1930021 - Novel amide derivatives as growth hormone secretagogues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8650 / JP | For all designated states Molecular Research Institute 2495 Old Middlefield Way Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishiyama, Nobuo Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 02 /
Ishige, Hirohide Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 03 /
Mimura, Mitsuo Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 04 /
Okuno, Tadashi Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 05 /
Ukai, Kiyoharu Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 06 /
Kiyofuji, Takeshi Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 07 /
Tauchi, Shinji Central Res. Inst. Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 301, Gensuke Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-8646 / JP | 08 /
Inoguchi, Kiyoshi Central Res. Inst. Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 09 /
Huang, Ping 117 Whits Rd. Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 10 /
Loew, Gilda H. Molecular Res. Inst 2495, Old Middlefield Way Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
Ishiyama, Nobuo Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishige, Hirohide Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
03 /
Mimura, Mitsuo Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
04 /
Okuno, Tadashi Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
05 /
Ukai, Kiyoharu Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
06 /
Kiyofuji, Takeshi Central Res. Inst., Kaken Pharm., Co. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
07 /
Tauchi, Shinji Central Res. Inst. Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 301, Gensuke Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-8646 / JP | |||
08 /
Inoguchi, Kiyoshi Central Res. Inst. Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 14, Shinomiya Minami Kawahara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | |||
09 /
Huang, Ping Molecular Res. Inst. 2495 Old Middlefield Way Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
10 /
Loew, Gilda H. Molecular Res. Inst 2495, Old Middlefield Way Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001899.7 | 17.02.2000 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | US19990251734 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: US 251734 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1930021 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1930021 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/05, C07K5/06, C07K5/065, C07K14/60 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
C07K5/06165 (EP,US);
C07K5/06 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K5/0202 (EP,US);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/24] | Title | German: | Neue Amidderivate als Wachstumshormonssekretagoge | [2008/24] | English: | Novel amide derivatives as growth hormone secretagogues | [2008/24] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés d'amide en tant que secrétagogues d'hormone de croissance | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00921329.9 / EP1158996 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9425482 (EVANS HERBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,14 * Abstract; sequence 67 and 106. *; | [X]US4372941 (RYAN JAMES W [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,14 * Abstract; compound of claim 13. *; | [X]US4818748 (BENDER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,14 * Abstract; example 88, compound N-tert-butoxycarbonyl-L-prolyl-L-phenylalanyl-L-histidine. *; | [DX]WO9618643 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [DX] 1,2,6,7,14 * Abstract; compounds of examples 5,6,9-19, 23, 27, 28, 30 and 31 on p. 10-12. *; | [DX]WO9507291 (FERRING BV [NL], et al) [DX] 1-3,6-8,14 * Abstract; compounds 3, 4, 8, 10, 37, 38, 46, 53, 56, 60, 62, 64, 65, 67, 204-207. *; | [DX]WO9530687 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,6-8,14 * Abstract; compounds on p. 3 and 28-47. *; | [DX]WO9500536 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3,6,7,14 * Abstract; preparations 3(2), 4(1), 8(2), 9(1), 17(2), 25 (2), 26 (1), 30 (2) and 31 (1); and examples 1 (2), 2, 3(2), 4(2), 5(2), 6(2), 7(2), 8-45, 46(2), 47(2), 48(2) and 49(2). *; | [DX]WO9420126 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3,6,7,14 * Abstract; compounds a and b on p. 19. *; | [DX]EP0684257 (ADIR [FR]) [DX] 1-3,6,7,14 * Abstract; example 1-11. *; | [DX]EP0443132 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [DX] 1-3,6,7,14 * Compounds a-c on p. 12, preparations 4(2), 5(1), 11-1(2) to 11-9(2), 12(1) to 12-8 (1), 13(1); examples 1(2), 2-1 (2) to 2-8 (2), 3(2), 4-1(2) to 4.3(2), 5(2) to 8(2). *; | [X]US4395401 (PFEIFFER FRANCIS R) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * Abstract; examples 4, 5, 8 and 10. *; | [A]WO9304081 (UNIV TULANE [US]) [A] * Abstract; claim 1. *; | [A]WO9615148 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] * Abstract; claim 1; compounds on p. 46-67. * | [X] - WALPOLE C ET AL, "2-NITROPHENYLCARBAMOYL-(S)-PROLYL-(S)-3-(2-NAPHTHYL)ALANYL-N-BENZYL-N- METHYLAMIDE (SDZ NKT 343), A POTENT HUMAN NK1 TACHYKININ RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST WITH GOOD ORAL ANALGESIC ACTIVITY IN CHRONIC PAIN MODELS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19980813), vol. 41, no. 17, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3159 - 3173, XP000972902 [X] 1,2,5-7,14 * Abstract; compounds 4k, h; 5f, g, k-5am. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970499g | [X] - STUERZEBERGER J ET AL, "Synthetische Inhibitoren der Serinproteasen", PHARMAZIE, VEB VERLAG VOLK UND GESUNDHEIT. BERLIN, DD, (1987), vol. 42, no. 2, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 114 - 116, XP002169714 [X] 1-3,6,14 * Abstract; compounds 19, 39 and 61 of table 1. * | [X] - AUBRY A ET AL, "BETA-I-TURN AND BETA-II-TURN CONFORMATIONS IN MODEL DIPEPTIDES WITH THE PROLINE-XAA SEQUENCES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1985), vol. 107, no. 25, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7640 - 7647, XP002477236 [X] 1-4,6,7,14 * Abstract; compounds 4-6 of table III and compounds 9, 10, 16, 17 of table V. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00311a069 | [X] - DESHPANDE M S ET AL, "MAPPING THE BINDING SITE OF TISSUE KALLIKREIN PREPARATION AND TESTING OF ALL POSSIBLE SUBSTRATE ANALOG INHIBITORS HOMOLOGOUS WITH THE SEQUENCE OF KININOGEN BETWEEN SER-386 AND GLN-392", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 35, no. 17, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3094 - 3102, XP002477237 [X] 1-4,6,7,14 * Abstract; compounds 20, 21 of table II. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00095a002 | [X] - HAGIWARA D ET AL, "STUDIES ON NEUROKININ ANTAGONISTS. 4 SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF NOVEL DIPEPTIDE SUBSTANCE P ANTAGONISTS: N2Ú(4R)-4-HYDROXY-1-Ú(1-METHYL-1H-INDOL-3-YL )CARBONYL-L-PROLYL-N-METHYL-N-(PHENYLMETHYL)-3-(2-NAPHTHYL)-L- ALANINAMIDE AND ITS RELATED COMPOUNDS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19940624), vol. 37, no. 13, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2090 - 2099, XP000571621 [X] 1-3,6,7,14 * Abstract; compounds 7k, 3f-i, 4a-k, 7a-r. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00039a022 | by applicant | US3239345 | US4036979 | US4411890 | US4851408 | US4880777 | US5206235 | US5283241 | US5284841 | US5310737 | US5317017 | US5374721 | US5430144 | US5434261 | US5536716 | US5545735 | US5559128 | US5576301 | US5583130 | US5492916 | US5492920 | US5494919 | US5578593 | US5622973 | US5652235 | US5663171 | US5672596 | US5721250 | US5723616 | US5726307 | US5726319 | US5731317 | US5767085 | US5767118 | US5767124 | US5773441 | US5777112 | US5783582 | US5798337 | US5804578 | EP0144230 | EP0513974 | WO9407486 | WO9408583 | WO9411012 | WO9413696 | WO9503290 | WO9509633 | WO9512598 | WO9513069 | WO9514666 | WO9516692 | WO9516675 | WO9517422 | WO9517423 | WO9534311 | WO9602530 | WO9605195 | WO9613265 | WO9615148 | WO9622997 | WO9624580 | WO9624587 | WO9635713 | WO9638471 | WO9700894 | WO9706803 | WO9706809 | WO9707117 | WO9711697 | WO9715191 | WO9722620 | WO9723508 | WO9724369 | WO9734604 | WO9736873 | WO9736878 | WO9740023 | WO9740071 | WO9741878 | WO9741879 | WO9803473 | WO9810653 | WO9816527 | WO9818815 | WO9825622 | WO9825897 | WO9846569 | WO9851687 | WO9858947 | WO9858948 | WO9858950 | WO9909991 | WO9204371 | WO9222569 | WO9420126 | WO9500536 | WO9530687 | WO9507291 | WO9618643 | WO9831704 | WO9912572 | EP0443132 | EP0684257 | WO8907110 | WO8907111 | WO9304081 | US5246920 | - ROBINSON; CLARK, GROWTH HORMONE: BASIC AND CLINICAL ASPECT, (1987), pages 109 - 127 | - LOW,L.C.K., NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY, (1991), vol. 53, pages 37 - 40 | - THOMER, M.O., ACTA PEDIATR, (1993), vol. 388, pages 2 - 7 | - PHARM.REV., (1994), vol. 46, pages 1 - 33 | - GUILLEMIN, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 218, pages 585 - 587 | - BOWERS, C.Y. ET AL., Molecular Endocrinology. Maclntyne, ELSEVIER, (1977), pages 287 - 292 | - CODD,E.E. ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 28, pages 1139 - 1144 | - HOWARD,D.H. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, pages 974 - 976 | - LARON,A., DRUGS, (1995), vol. 50, pages 595 - 601 | - DEVITA,R.J. ET AL., DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1996), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 273 - 281 | - SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 1640 - 1643 | - B.J.GERTZ., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 77, pages 1393 - 1397 | - CHEW,C. ET AL., MOL.PHARM., (1991), vol. 39, page 502 | - HUANG,P. ET AL., J.COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN., (1997), vol. 11, pages 21 - 28 | - CANALIS,E., CLIN.ORTHOP., (1985), vol. 193, pages 246 - 263 | - KAWAGUCHI, H. ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1994), vol. 135, pages 774 - 781 | - NAKAMURA, T. ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1995), vol. 136, pages 1276 - 1284 | - SHIDA,J. ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 14, pages 265 - 272 | - STILE,C.D. ET AL., PROC.NATLACAD.SCI., (1979), vol. 76, pages 1279 - 1283 | - CHEN,Y. ET AL., CELL PHYSOL., (1989), vol. 140, pages 59 - 67 | - AMATO ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 1671 - 1676 | - BENGTSSON ET AL., JOURNA OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 309 - 317 | - BINNERTS ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 37, pages 79 - 87 | - BOWERS ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 76, no. 4, pages 817 - 823 | - CUNEO ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 688 - 694 | - CUNEO ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 695 - 700 | - DEGERBLAD ET AL., ACTA ENDOCRINOLOGICA, (1992), vol. 126, pages 387 - 393 | - EDEN ET AL., ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND THROMBOSIS, (1993), vol. 13829, pages 296 - 301 | - HARTMAN ET AL., HORM RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 40, pages 37 - 47 | - HO ET AL., HORM RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 40, pages 80 - 86 | - JOGENSEN ET AL., ACTA ENDOCRINOLOGICA, (1991), vol. 125, pages 449 - 453 | - JOGENSEN ET AL., THE LANCET, (19890603), pages 1221 - 1224 | - LAMBERT ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 37, pages 111 - 115 | - MCGAULEY ET AL., HORM RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 33, pages 52 - 54 | - MOLLER ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 39, pages 403 - 408 | - O'HALLORAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 1344 - 1348 | - ORME ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 37, pages 453 - 459 | - RODRIGUEZ-AMAO ET AL., HORM RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 39, pages 87 - 88 | - ROSEN ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1994), vol. 40, pages 111 - 116 | - ROSEN ET AL., ACTA ENDOCRINOLOGICA, (1993), vol. 129, pages 195 - 200 | - RUDMAN, THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1990), vol. 323, no. 1, pages 1 - 6 | - SALMON ET AL., THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1989), vol. 321, no. 26, pages 1797 - 1803 | - SHIBASAKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1984), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 212 - 214 | - SONKSEN ET AL., ACTA PAEDIATR SCAND, (1991), vol. 379, pages 139 - 146 | - TAUBER ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 1135 - 1139 | - VANDEWEGHE ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 39, pages 409 - 415 | - WHITEHEAD ET AL., CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 36, pages 45 - 52 | - GOODMAN; GILMANS, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapertics, MCGRAW HILL INC., (1993), page 1353 | - W. C. STILL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, pages 2923 - 2925 | - CHEN, ENDOCLINOLOGY, (1989), vol. 124, pages 2791 - 2798 | - CHEN ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1991), vol. 129, pages 3337 - 3342 |