EP1946940 - Writing instrument for use in a toy set comprising a water-metachromatic cloth sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PILOT INK CO., LTD. 17, Midori-cho 3-chome, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 466 / JP | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakashima, Akio c/o The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd. 17, Midori-cho 3 chome Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kani, Takao c/o The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd. 17, Midori-cho 3 chome Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08001913.6 | 04.10.2000 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990284005 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28400599 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946940 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946940 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B44F1/10, B43K8/12 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
B43K11/005 (EP,US);
G09B11/00 (KR);
B43K11/00 (EP,US);
B43K27/08 (EP,US);
B43K8/02 (EP,US);
B43L1/00 (EP,US);
B43L1/002 (EP,US);
B44D2/002 (EP,US);
B44F1/10 (EP,US);
D06M11/79 (EP,US);
D06P1/004 (EP,US);
D06P1/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/30] | Title | German: | Schreibgegenstand für Anwendung in Spielzeug mit wasser-metachromatischem Textil | [2008/30] | English: | Writing instrument for use in a toy set comprising a water-metachromatic cloth sheet | [2008/30] | French: | Objet d'écriture pour utilisation dans un jouet comprenant un tissu ayant des propriétés métachromatiques au contact de l'eau | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2010 | 03.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00308708.7 / EP1091039 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4343880 (SCHWAN STABILO SCHWANHAEUSSER [DE]) [X] 1,1 * column 2, line 30 - line 67; figure 1; claims 1-9 * * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]WO9821052 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 2 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 5; figures 1,6 *; | [A]JPH0274688 ; | [DA]US5163846 (LEE JAMES S W [US]) [DA] 1,2 * column A *; | [A]EP0919604 (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4810562 (OKAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A *; | [A]EP0776645 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4022211 (TIMMONS TERRY K, et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900606), vol. 014, no. 261, Database accession no. (C - 0725), & JP02074688 A 19900314 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS505097B | JPH0515389B | US5163846 |