EP1970336 - Image scanning apparatus and image scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3, Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Osamu c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001958.1 | 01.02.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | JP20070067358 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007067358 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1970336 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1970336 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970336 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/18, // B65H3/06, B65H1/18, H04N1/00 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B65H7/18 (EP,US);
B65H1/18 (EP,US);
B65H3/06 (EP,US);
H04N1/00567 (EP,US);
H04N1/0062 (EP,US);
H04N1/00631 (EP,US);
H04N1/00649 (EP,US);
H04N1/00652 (EP,US);
H04N1/0408 (EP,US);
H04N1/0443 (EP,US);
H04N1/2032 (EP,US);
B65H2405/15 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414 (EP,US);
B65H2513/512 (EP,US);
H04N1/121 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US);
H04N2201/33328 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/03 (US,EP);
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414, B65H2220/01 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2008/38] | B65H7/18, // B65H3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/35] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildscanningvorrichtung und Bildscanner | [2008/38] | English: | Image scanning apparatus and image scanner | [2008/38] | French: | Appareil de balayage d'images et scanner d'images | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 24.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5295678 (LINDNER BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07157099 (SHARP KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH08290841 (CANON KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5988628 (MORI AKIHITO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005206972 (SHIMIZU KOJI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005225022 (AKIYAMA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]JP2006016093 (KYOCERA MITA CORP) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006016093 | JP2007067358 |