EP2084968 - Method for processing items such as pieces of meat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel hf. Austurhraun 9 210 Gardabaer / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Marel HF. Austurhraun 9 210 Gardabaer / IS | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorsson, Brynjolfur Kvistaland 20 108 Reykjavik / IS | 02 /
Axelsson, Stefan Jorsalir 5 201 Kopavogur / IS | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Inspicos A/S European Patent Attorneys Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2009/32] | Olesen, Kaj, et al Patentgruppen Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 08002022.5 | 04.02.2008 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084968 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084968 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A22B5/00, A22B7/00, A22C17/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A22C17/0093 (EP,US);
A22C18/00 (US);
B65G47/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | A22B5/00, A22B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verarbeiten von Einheiten wie etwa Fleischstücken | [2009/32] | English: | Method for processing items such as pieces of meat | [2009/32] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement d'articles tels des pièces de viande | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 09.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11163154.5 / EP2353392 | EP12196042.1 / EP2625959 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2012
27.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Frontmatec Kolding A/S Platinvej 8 6000 Kolding / DK Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S, et al, et al Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 02
20.02.2012
24.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG Geniner Strasse 249 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [2019/45] |
Former [2019/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2012
27.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE SFK Systems A/S Albuen 37 6000 Kolding / DK Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S, et al, et al Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
02
20.02.2012
24.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG Geniner Strasse 249 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2012/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE SFK Systems A/S Albuen 37 6000 Kolding / DK Opponent's representative Larsen, Hans Ole Larsen & Birkeholm A/S, Banegårdspladsen 1, P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
02
20.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG Geniner Strasse 249 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | 23.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.10.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.09.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/01] | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T1082/15 | 03.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 20.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T1082/15 | 31.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | HR | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | LU | 04.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO0191565 (MAREL HF [IS], et al) [AD] 1 * page 2, lines 8-31; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO02068272 (P & G DEVELOPMENTS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]WO03077662 (SCANVAEGT INT AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 27, line 8 - page 29, line 2; figure 4 * | by applicant | WO9814370 | WO0191565 | WO03077662 |