EP2087990 - Vacuum bagging of composite materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet - DTU Bygning 101 A, Anker Engelundsvej 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lystrup, Aage Scheel Gyvelvej 6A 2. th. 4000 Roskilde / DK | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 08002147.0 | 06.02.2008 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087990 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/44 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
B29C70/44 (EP);
B29C43/3642 (EP);
B29C70/542 (EP);
B29C70/544 (EP);
B29C2043/3644 (EP);
B29C2043/3647 (EP);
B29C43/203 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/16] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vakuumverpackung von Verbundmaterialien | [2009/33] | English: | Vacuum bagging of composite materials | [2009/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux composites par mise sous vide | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1916091 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [E] 1-3,5-7,9-11 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figures 6-11 *; | [XA]US6743504 (ALLEN GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 60; figures 3,7,8 * [A] 2-9,11; | [XA]US2005253309 (HOU TAN-HUNG [US], et al) [X] 10 * abstract * [A] 1-9,11; | [XA]US5039371 (CREMENS WALTER S [US], et al) [X] 8 * column 3, line 63 - line 68; figure 1 * * column 5, line 29 - line 34 * [A] 1-7,9-11 | by applicant | US5292475 |