EP1947062 - Hydrophobically modified polymers and its use as dispersant and for preventing scale [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2009/22] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodrigues, Klein A. 108 Grayson Road Signal Mountain Tennessee 37377 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Department Legal & IP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Department Legal & IP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2009/34] | Rådbo, Lars Olof, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal & IP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2009/32] | Rådbo, Lars Olof, et al Akzo Nobel AB c/o Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08002212.2 | 31.10.2005 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | US20040979019 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 979019 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1947062 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1947062 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/10, C08F220/00, C02F1/56, C11D3/37 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F5/10 (EP,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C11D3/3757 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F212/08, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F220/06, C08F212/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Hydrophob modifizierte Polymere | [2008/30] | English: | Hydrophobically modified polymers and its use as dispersant and for preventing scale | [2008/30] | French: | Polymères hydrophobiquement modifiés | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05023748.6 / EP1652825 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0398724 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, lines 46,54,55; examples 1,40; claims 1,4-6,9,10,12 *; | [X]US5232622 (JONES CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 17; examples 18,26,27; claim 1; tables 2,4 *; | [X]DE4328817 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 61 - page 6, line 30; example 8; claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP1088794 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0014]; claims 1,2,6; table 1 *; | [AD]US6617302 (GHATLIA NARESH DHIRAJLAL [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 14 - column 4, line 58; examples 1-12; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1346957 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0027]; examples 1,2; claims 1-5,7-11,14 *; | [A]US2004053808 (RAEHSE WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraphs [0194] - [0207]; claim 10 * | by applicant | US4711725 | US5147576 | US5547612 | US5650473 | US5698512 | US5789571 | US5866076 | US6114294 | US6395185 | US2003072950 | US6617302 | WO2004061067 |