EP1959194 - Mixing device for a gas fan burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co. KG Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Specht, Heinz-Gert Winkelweg 13 34466 Wolfhagen / DE | 02 /
Dzubiella, Manfred, Dr. Sternstrasse 47 35066 Frankenberg / DE | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Michael, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Wolf & Wolf Hirschstrasse 7 63450 Hanau / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2013/12] | Wolf, Michael, et al Hirschstrasse 7 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Wolf, Michael, et al Wolf & Wolf Hirschstrasse 7 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Wolf, Michael An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 08002286.6 | 07.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | DE20071008460 | 19.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007008460 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959194 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959194 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/36, F23D14/62, F23L15/02 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F23D14/62 (EP);
F23D14/36 (EP);
F23L15/02 (EP);
F23D2900/14642 (EP);
Y02E20/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mischeinrichtung für einen Gasgebläsebrenner | [2008/34] | English: | Mixing device for a gas fan burner | [2008/34] | French: | Dispositif de mélange pour un brûleur à gaz comprenant un ventilateur | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2008 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MT | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.02.2017 | IE | 07.02.2017 | LU | 07.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 07.03.2017 | GB | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.02.2008 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
AT | 07.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.02.2008 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
AT | 07.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
AT | 07.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
AT | 07.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]DE19756301 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [DX] 1,9,10 * column 1, line 3 - line 31 * * column 2, line 27 - line 33; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]US3807940 (JURICEK E) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 44 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0896191 (DUNGS KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] *; | [DY]DE102004007123 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [DY] 4-8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006019279 (KYUNGDONG BOILER CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0074] , [0112] - [0114] - [0128] , [0136] , [0141] , [0159] , [0165] , [0168]; figures 5,12,13 *; | [A]DE2151611 (RHEINSTAHL AG) [A] 2 * page 2, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102004007123 | DE19756301 |