EP1949867 - Motion detector for controlling electrosurgical output [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sartor, Joe Don 1036 Katy Lane Longmont CO 80504-7326 / US | 02 /
Schmaltz, Dale Francis 2319 Westview Road Fort Collins CO 80524 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08002357.5 | 17.02.2004 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | US20030448520P | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 448520 P | US20040533695P | 01.01.2004 Original published format: US 533695 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949867 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949867 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2008/31] | Title | German: | Bewegungsnachweisgerät zur Kontrolle des elektrochirurgischen Ausgangs | [2008/31] | English: | Motion detector for controlling electrosurgical output | [2008/31] | French: | Détecteur de mouvement pour contrôler un résultat électrochirurgical | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04711864.1 / EP1596743 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040711864) is 18.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | GB | 17.02.2014 | IE | 17.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | [2015/09] |
Former [2015/08] | ES | 31.07.2013 | |
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 17.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | ES | 31.07.2013 | |
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 31.07.2013 | |
IT | 31.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4625723 (ALTNETHER PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - line 59 * * column 4, line 1 - line 14 *; | [Y]US6494882 (LEBOUITZ KYLE S [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,6,7,9-12,14-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - line 38 *; | [Y]US6386032 (LEMKIN MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 2,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 15 - line 31 *; | [Y]US5178012 (CULP GORDON W [US]) [Y] 4,5,13 * abstract *; | [A]US6249706 (SOBOTA JOHN [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]US6286512 (LOEB MARVIN P [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9639086 (VALLEYLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2004010883 (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5367217 | US5339698 | US5331242 | US5594170 | US5501103 | US5379639 | US5377545 | US5456111 | US5456110 | US5005413 | US6068627 | US20020398620 | US20020424352 |