EP1959404 - Medium processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furihata, Hideki c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Furihata, Hideki c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Hoffmann, Eckart Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 08002819.4 | 15.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | JP20070037454 | 19.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007037454 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959404 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1959404 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959404 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00, B65H29/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
B65H5/02 (EP,KR,US);
G07D11/16 (EP,KR,US);
G07D11/235 (EP);
G07D7/04 (EP);
B65H2301/3122 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2301/321 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2301/44312 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2404/253 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,KR,US);
G07D2211/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | G07D11/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2010/01] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medienverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2008/34] | English: | Medium processing apparatus | [2008/34] | French: | Appareil de traitement de support | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 23.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3715031 (OKKONEN O) [X] 1,2,6,15 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4585125 (MORI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 49 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5259490 (GARDELLINI MARIA [US]) [X] 1,2,6,12,15 * column 3, line 9 - line 68 ** figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2004251588 (PANINI UGO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | US4585125 |