EP1961576 - Ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakagami, Yusuke c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003102.4 | 20.02.2008 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | JP20070041848 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007041848 | JP20070041849 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007041849 | JP20070041850 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007041850 | JP20070313142 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007313142 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961576 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1961576 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B41J11/00242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/01] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker | [2008/35] | English: | Ink jet printer | [2008/35] | French: | Imprimante à jet d'encre | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0978388 (MATTI TECHNOLOGY GMBH [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2354976 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 21 - line 25; figure 6 *; | [X]US2001030679 (KUBOTA HIDEMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 64]; figures 4, 7 *; | [X]US6508552 (STEINFIELD STEVEN W [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0043]; figures 3,5,6,7, 9; claims 17,41,46-48 *; | [X]US2004021756 (YAMAZAKI YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 24] , [0 61] , [0074]; figures 3-5, 7 *; | [X]US2004036753 (HIRAI YOKO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0119]; figures 2a, 2b *; | [X]EP1533129 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 16]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO2006051484 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1* paragraph [0056]; figures 1c,2; claim 2 *; | [XP]US2007120929 (WU CHUAN-YI [TW], et al) [XP] 1 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0 18] , [0 21] - [0023]; figures 2, 3; claim 6 * | by applicant | JPH05338126 |