EP1916839 - Image pickup apparatus and moving picture photographing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Hiroshi c/o Int. Prop. Dept. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1 Sakae-cho 3-chome, Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
Yokoi, Makoto c/o Int. Prop. Dept. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1 Sakae-cho 3-chome, Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2014/02] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
Shimizu, Hiroshi c/o Int. Prop. Dept. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1 Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Yokoi, Makoto c/o Int. Prop. Dept. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1 Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003129.7 | 25.08.2004 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030324118 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003324118 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916839 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916839 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8047 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/18] | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und entsprechendes Verfahren zum Fotografieren bewegter Bilder | [2008/18] | English: | Image pickup apparatus and moving picture photographing method thereof | [2008/18] | French: | Appareil de capture d'image et son procédé de photographie de photo en mouvement | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04772567.6 / EP1678944 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040772567) is 04.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4035574 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 1, line 25 - line 38 * * column 2, line 1 - line 6 * * column 2, line 35 - line 37 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 2, line 61 - line 64 * * column 3, line 34 - line 39 * * column 3, line 47 - line 51 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 21 ** figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5517241 (ADACHI KAORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, line 45 - line 67 * * column 2, line 41 - line 54 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 50 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0982950 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2001038417 (UEHARA RYO [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1,2,6A,6B *; | [Y]US6564329 (CHEUNG EDMUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 1 - line 9 * * column 5, line 21 - line 39 * * column 6, line 12 - line 40 * * column 7, line 1 - line 3 * * column 7, line 53 - line 55 * * column 10, line 28 - line 49 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2003133504 (HANAMI ATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0015] , [0017] , [0051] , [0057] , [0066] , [0069] , [0072] , [0075] , [0079] , [0081] , [0088] , [0089] * * figures 1-14,19-21,23-27 *; | [Y] - JVC, Digital Video Camera GR-DVL 867,865,767,765,567,367,365,167,160 instructions, JVC, (20020209), XP002311271 [Y] 8,9 * page 16 * | by applicant | US5517241 | US6564329 |