EP2093964 - Method for dynamic configuration of application components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferralasco, Daniela Via Capraia 1/12 16136 Genova / IT | 02 /
Costanzo, Luca Via Pomposa 11/7 1127 Genova / IT | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Kley, Hansjörg Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Kley, Hansjörg Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003153.7 | 21.02.2008 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093964 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/24 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L67/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/18] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur dynamischen Konfiguration von Anwendungskomponenten | [2009/35] | English: | Method for dynamic configuration of application components | [2009/35] | French: | Procédé de configuration dynamique de composants d'application | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9847057 (R2K LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0023] ** figures 2a,2b,2c,2d *; | [X]US6105066 (HAYES JR KENT FILLMORE [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2,12,17 * * column 4, lines 11-51 * * column 5, lines 40-49 * * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 40 * * column 9, lines 12-63 * * column 11, line 16 - column 17, line 15 *; | [X]US2003097427 (PARRY TRAVIS J [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 5, lines 1-14 * * page 6, lines 4-9 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 26 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 17 * * page 14, lines 3-21 * * page 17, line 19 - page 20, line 20 * * claims 1-5,8,13 * * figure 1 * |