EP1929853 - Actuation for a driveable gardening device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viking GmbH Hans Peter Stihl-Strasse 5 6336 Langkampfen-Kufstein / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Viking GmbH Hans-Peter-Stihl-Strasse 5 6336 Langkampfen-Kufstein / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Reinhold Rauchenbergstr. 4 6111 Volders / AT | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003157.8 | 10.11.2005 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | EP20040026659 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04026659 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929853 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929853 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/69, F16H9/04 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A01D34/69 (EP);
F16H55/56 (EP);
F16H63/067 (EP);
F16H7/0827 (EP);
F16H9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | Antrieb für ein fahrbares Gartengerät | [2008/24] | English: | Actuation for a driveable gardening device | [2008/24] | French: | Entraînement pour un appareil de jardinerie mobile | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 05.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05024503.4 / EP1656824 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | AT | 10.11.2010 | GB | 10.11.2010 | LU | 10.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
AT | 10.11.2010 | ||
GB | 10.11.2010 | ||
LU | 10.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
AT | 10.11.2010 | ||
GB | 10.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
AT | 10.11.2010 | ||
GB | 10.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
GB | 10.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/28] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 24.02.2010 | |
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 24.02.2010 | |
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB825933 (LADEN S A) [A] 1 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1216293 (INT HARVESTER CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 47 - page 2, line 118; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE2950459 (FUSO LIGHT ALLOYS CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1* page 4, paragraph 9 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE2950459 | DE3715336 |